Grecia v. DISH Network L.L.C.

Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02808
Filed: June 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING RECORDING (See 69 Settlement Conference Minutes). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/2/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 6, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 67 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
December 14, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 2/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 12/14/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
November 30, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2015 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/30/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 17, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ***correcting ECF Docket entry ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEPHEN V. JARVIS PRO HAC VICE re 50 . Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2015)
October 6, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
September 10, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/30/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2015 at 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/10/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. DISH Network L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Todd Christopher Atkins
Represented By: Stephen Charles Jarvis
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dish Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert R. Laurenzi
Represented By: Michael Joseph Malecek, Esq.
Represented By: Michelle Kristina Marek
Represented By: Robert W. Unikel
Represented By: Robert Wolf Unikel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?