Latasha McLaughlin v. Wells Fargo Bank NA

Plaintiff: Latasha McLaughlin
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2015cv02904
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2016 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF 151 CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/18/2016. Motions due by 1/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 1, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 153 VACATING SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES, SHORTENING TIME FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL, AND CONTINUING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Class Action Settle ment: Responses due by 11/7/2016. Replies due by 11/11/2016. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/23/2017 07:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
October 19, 2016 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER POSTPONING DEADLINES AND REQUIRING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/2016. Responses due by 11/3/2016. Replies due by 11/10/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 6, 2016 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Replies due by 10/27/2016. Responses due by 10/20/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 21, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION AND DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AS MOOT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/21/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2016)
September 1, 2016 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 141 STIPULATION CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR CLASS NOTICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 29, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING JOINT PROPOSAL FOR CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/29/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 16, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 132 MOTION TO STAY AND VACATING HEARING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
July 1, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 129 STIPULATION TO RESET DEADLINES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 22, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 61 MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
June 7, 2016 115 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIESFOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)
May 18, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
March 29, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 100 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER TO FILE WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S PROPOSED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 1, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 71 82 84 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 17, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART 73 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND VACATING HEARINGS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 9, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY Responses due by 2/16/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/9/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
February 1, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL 54 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016)
January 29, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE 58 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2016)
December 10, 2015 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
November 24, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 40 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING 43 CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
October 29, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER THAT TILA REQUIRED INSURANCE PROCEEDS TO BE REFLECTED IN PAYOFF STATEMENT 20 .(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 26, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)
October 16, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/16/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
August 24, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 STIPULATION.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 12, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CMC. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 8/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latasha McLaughlin v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha McLaughlin
Represented By: Patricia I. Avery
Represented By: Kristin J. Moody
Represented By: Aidan Chowning Poppler
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?