Hahn v. Rash Curtis & Associates

Plaintiff: Leah Hahn
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Case Number: 4:2015cv02915
Filed: June 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 29 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
February 17, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Request to Vacate Settlement Conference set for 2/19/2016 11:00 AM re 27 Notice of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/17/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
September 10, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Hon. William Alsup denying 16 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 3, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
August 21, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/21/15. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Hahn
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Arvin Ratanavongse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?