Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 456344 v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 456344
Defendant: Colby Robinson, James Kerr, Bruce Shakman, Eric Collin, Grange Insurance Association and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv02946
Filed: June 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/3/2016 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/29/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)
November 23, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating order referring case to Mediation. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/23/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
September 24, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/24/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
July 9, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 456344 v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London, subscribing to Certificate No. 456344
Represented By: Joan Elaine Cochran
Represented By: Aya Jo Deam
Represented By: Lisa Kralik Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colby Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Shakman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Collin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grange Insurance Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?