Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC, Aladina Beth Capaccioli and Susan Sanguinetti
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02976
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2015 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015)
August 18, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment re: Duty to Defend and Breach of the Duty to Defend filed by Susan Sanguinetti, Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC, Aladina Beth Capaccioli. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
July 23, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by Susan Sanguinetti, Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC, Aladina Beth Capaccioli. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 23, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC et al v. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Brokers Insurance Solutions LLC
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aladina Beth Capaccioli
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sanguinetti
Represented By: Gary Robert Selvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Ann K. Johnston
Represented By: Ted Aubrey Vincett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?