Dickerson v. Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC

Plaintiff: Tyrone Dickerson
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv02979
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Tyrone Dickerson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 11, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
January 13, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 Stipulation and Order AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Tyrone Dickerson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2016)
January 6, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION filed by Tyrone Dickerson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 6, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
January 5, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATED AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 5, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
October 14, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties 10/14/2015. Mediation deadline 1/7/2016. Fact discovery cut-off 4/22/2016. Expert disclosures due 4/29/2016. Expert rebuttal due 5/13/2016. Expert discovery due 5/27/2016. Dispositive motions due 6/ 10/2016. Pretrial conference statement due 4/23/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2016 - 10/6/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 7, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 29, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE re 15 Case Management Statement filed by Tyrone Dickerson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
September 10, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 10 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Tyrone Dickerson filed by Tyrone Dickerson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 10, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Gypsum LLC
Represented By: Susan Wallis Pangborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Dickerson
Represented By: Stephen Michael Murphy
Represented By: Pragya Bobby Shukla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?