Dell Inc. et al v. LG Chem, LTD et al

Plaintiff: Dell Inc. and Dell Products L.P.
Defendant: LG Chem, LTD, LG Chem America, Inc, Panasonic Corporation, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, SANYO Electric Co.Ltd., Sanyo North America Corporation, GS Yuasa Corporation, Toshiba Corporaton, Sony Corporation, Sony Energy Devices Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc., SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD and SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 4:2015cv02987
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT TOSHIBA CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers ;denying (1310) Motion to Dismiss; denying (1431) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02420-YGR; denying (55) Motion to Dismiss in case 4:15-cv-02987-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
June 24, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice (1327) Stipulation in case 4:13-md-02420-YGR; denying without prejudice (61) Stipulation in case 4:15-cv-02987-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
January 6, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (1004 in 4:13-md-02420-YGR) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc., (50 in 4:15-cv-02987-YGR) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Dell Products L.P., Dell Inc. Defendants Panasonic Corporation a nd Panasonic Corporation of North America and Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. and Sanyo North America Corporation dismissed with Prejudice re Individual Action (15-cv-2987-YGR). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/6/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
August 27, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without Prejudice 3 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
July 21, 2015 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/21/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dell Inc. et al v. LG Chem, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANYO Electric Co.Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Yuasa Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Energy Devices Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Kelley Connolly Barnaby
Represented By: Debra Dawn Bernstein
Represented By: Rodney J Ganske
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Matthew David Kent
Represented By: Micah Dean Moon
Represented By: Douglas R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dell Products L.P.
Represented By: Kelley Connolly Barnaby
Represented By: Debra Dawn Bernstein
Represented By: Rodney J Ganske
Represented By: Donald MacKaye Houser
Represented By: Michael P. Kenny
Represented By: Matthew David Kent
Represented By: Micah Dean Moon
Represented By: Douglas R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?