NAVA et al v. BARRERA & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al

Plaintiff: FRANCISCO NAVA, ENRIQUE LOPEZ and JORGE L. SANCHEZ
Defendant: BARRERA & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTION, INC., WILLIAM ISRAEL BARRERA and HERSON ISRAEL BARRERA
Case Number: 4:2015cv03235
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED 26 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re 27 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/4/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
December 18, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 12/18/2015. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
November 19, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation Re 23 Case Management Conference, to Extend Mediation Cut Off and Continue CMC to Hold Mediation (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
September 11, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAVA et al v. BARRERA & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCISCO NAVA
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENRIQUE LOPEZ
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORGE L. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Tomas Eduardo Margain
Represented By: Huy Ngoc Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRERA & ASSOCIATES CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ISRAEL BARRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERSON ISRAEL BARRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?