Hunt v. Geekatoo, Inc.

Plaintiff: Brian Hunt
Defendant: Geekatoo, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03313
Filed: July 16, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 2/16/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
December 21, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/25/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
August 24, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 7 Motion to Certify Class without prejudice.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Geekatoo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hunt
Represented By: Rebecca Leah Davis
Represented By: Richard Toshiyuki Drury
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geekatoo, Inc.
Represented By: Krista Lee Baughman
Represented By: Harmeet K. Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?