Free Kick Master LLC v. Apple, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Free Kick Master LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc, Amazon.com Inc, Google Inc. and Samsung Electronics USA
Case Number: 4:2015cv03403
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2016 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 118 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Free Kick Master Junior, LLC, Free Kick Master LLC. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/12/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
February 29, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton Granting Motions to Dismiss.(pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 6, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/6/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
October 19, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 63 Motion to Dismiss; granting 66 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
October 14, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE NOVEMBER 5, 2015, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/13/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
September 9, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/9/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2015)
August 10, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/10/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 7, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF COUNSEL STANLEY L. JOSSELSON re 58 Proposed Order filed by Free Kick Master LLC. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Free Kick Master LLC v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Free Kick Master LLC
Represented By: Eugene Steven Alkana
Represented By: Stanley L. Josselson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Jonathon W. Groza
Represented By: H. Alan Rothenbuecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C. Gratz
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics USA
Represented By: William A. Doyle
Represented By: Jacob K. Poorman
Represented By: John C. Ulin
Represented By: John Charles Ulin
Represented By: David H. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?