Quinonez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company

Plaintiff: Raul Quinonez
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv03409
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/13/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
November 2, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER.Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Selection set for 10/11/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Fra ncisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2016 to 10/19/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/2/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
October 27, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Request to Telephonically Appear at CMC filed by Raul Quinonez. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/27/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2015)
October 26, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Request to Telephonically Appear at CMC filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-678 to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/26/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinonez v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Quinonez
Represented By: Quynh Luong Nguyen
Represented By: Anthony Steven Petru
Represented By: Paula A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?