Robertson v. County of Alameda

Plaintiff: Frank Robertson
Defendant: County of Alameda, Alameda County Social Services Agency, Dana Castillo, Lori Cox, Laura Jackson, Andrea Ford, Denise Robinson and Gana Eason
Case Number: 4:2015cv03416
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2016 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 82 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
May 31, 2016 89 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 87 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by County of Alameda filed by County of Alameda. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
February 26, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/21/2016. ADR Deadlines 6/1/2016. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
January 5, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to withdraw as counsel and ORDER requesting reassignment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/05/16. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2016)
December 23, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court Scheduling ORDER re: 60 Motion to withdraw as counsel. 62 Motion to Shorten Time is DENIED. Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before the Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Opposition due 01/19/16. Reply due 01/25/16. Deadline to file amended complaint, 02/01/16 case management conference, and joint statement filing deadline are vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/23/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2015)
October 28, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Amended complaint due by 11/13/2015. Case Management Conference continued from 11/2/2015 to 2/1/2016 at 1:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/28/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
September 1, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting Plaintiff leave to amend and denying 20 Defendant's motion to dismiss as moot. Amended complaint due by 09/10/15. Stipulation or opposition to 25 Plaintiff's motion to remand due by 09/14/15. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. County of Alameda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Alameda
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Social Services Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Cox
Represented By: Scott John Feudale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gana Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Robertson
Represented By: James Joseph Fishel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?