Roberts et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Plaintiff: Marcus A. Roberts, Kenneth A. Chewey and Ashley M. Chewey
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv03418
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 81 to reset CMC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
March 13, 2017 79 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 Vacating Case Management Conference filed by Marcus A. Roberts, James Krenn, Kenneth A. Chewey, Ashley M. Chewey. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 12/14/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
November 15, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
June 27, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 61 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify for Immediate Interlocutory Appeal. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
April 27, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; and Staying Proceedings. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 5, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 54 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration.(emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
February 29, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration; and Staying Proceedings. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
December 15, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Ashley M. Chewey. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
September 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus A. Roberts
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Nicole Diane Sugnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Chewey
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Nicole Diane Sugnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley M. Chewey
Represented By: Roger Norton Heller
Represented By: Michael W. Sobol
Represented By: Nicole Diane Sugnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?