Word to Info Inc v. Google Inc

Plaintiff: Word To Info Inc
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03486
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2016 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims of infringement that Plaintiff raised or could have raised in this action are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. All claims, defenses, or counterclaims that Defendant raised are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/21/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
July 12, 2016 162 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 8, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 116 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS AND DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. WTI's motions for leave to amend its infringement contentions are GRANTED with respect to both Facebook and Google, and Google's motion to strike is DENIED AS MOOT. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
April 18, 2016 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED REQUEST TO MODIFY HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR WORD TO INFO, INC.S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS, Hearing date as to 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS continued to 6/10/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick (to coincide with date of tutorial). Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/18/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
April 12, 2016 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, as modified 125 STIPULATION TO MODIFY HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to 116 MOTION to Amend/Correct INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/12/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
November 24, 2015 103 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/24/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 9, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 93 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement. Case Management Statement due by 11/4/2015. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/09/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
October 19, 2015 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, if any, within 20 days of the date of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 1, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 13 Motion to Dismiss. If Google wishes to proceed with the motion, it shall notice it for an available hearing date no earlier than September 23, 2015. Google shall do so within seven days of the date of this order. If Google does not do so, the Clerk shall terminate the motion. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/01/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 12, 2015 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to e Hon. William H. Orrick. Hon. Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/12/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Word to Info Inc v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Word To Info Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Baker
Represented By: Steven R. Daniels
Represented By: Steven Robert Daniels
Represented By: James Robert Gourley
Represented By: Cassandra Klingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David J. Ball, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Philip Groombridge
Represented By: Michael K Hurst
Represented By: Damien Kieran
Represented By: Joshua M Sandler
Represented By: David Kenji Stark
Represented By: Jenny C Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?