American National Insurance Company v. Estate of Teresa P. Hughes

Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Defendant: Estate of Teresa P. Hughes, Frank Staggers, Frank Staggers, Jr., Barbara Staggers and Michael Staggers
Case Number: 4:2015cv03508
Filed: July 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS DEPOSITED BY AMERICAN NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY PLUS ACCRUED INTEREST; DISCHARGE OF PLAINTIFF; AND DISMISSAL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2016)
October 29, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 3 MOTIONBY PLAINTIFF AMERICANNATIONAL INSURANCECOMPANY TO DEPOSIT ANNUITYBENEFIT MONEY ININTERPLEADER; REQUEST THECOURT DEPOSIT FUNDS ININTEREST-BEARING ACCOUNT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
August 12, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CMC. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 8/12/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 11, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by J Executive Committee on 8/11/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American National Insurance Company v. Estate of Teresa P. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American National Insurance Company
Represented By: Adrienne Clare Publicover
Represented By: Francis Jude Torrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Teresa P. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Staggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Staggers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Staggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Staggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?