Kapu Gems et al v. Diamond Imports, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kapu Gems and Kapu Gems,Ltd.
Defendant: Diamond Imports, Inc. and Yair Yachdav
Case Number: 4:2015cv03531
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/17/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
April 5, 2017 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties shall file, no later than April 19, 2017, a joint report apprising the Court of the status of the case. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 04/05/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
February 15, 2017 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/15/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2017)
February 13, 2017 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 6 AND 7 IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Plaintiffs are directed to file in the public record, no earlier than February 17, 2017, and no later than February 23, 2017, the entirety of Exhibits 6 and 7. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 13, 2017 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/13/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
December 15, 2016 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING KAPU GEMS' MOTION TO AMEND THE PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. The Court denies Kapu Gems' request to extend the deadline to file dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/15/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)
November 22, 2016 114 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/22/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 16, 2016 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS DIAMOND IMPORTS, INC.'S AND YAIR YACHDAV'S UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RESPONSE AND REPLY BRIEFS TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants shall file their opposition no later than December 2, 2016. Plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than December 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/16/16.(mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON COUNTERDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 16, 2016 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/16/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 12, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PERSONAL INCOME TAX RETURNS AND EXTENDING DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/12/2016.(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
August 12, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AFFORDING COUNTERCLAIMANT LEAVE TO AMEND. (1) As against Kapu Gems Ltd. and Vaghani, the motions to dismiss are granted, and the Counterclaim is dismissed i n its entirety as to said counterdefendants. (2) As against Kapu Gems, to the extent counterdefendants seek dismissal of the First, Second, Third, Fifth, and Sixth Causes of Action, the motions to dismiss are granted, and said counterclaims are dismi ssed as to said counterdefendant; to the extent counterdefendants seek dismissal of the Fourth Cause of Action, the motions to dismiss are denied. (3) If Diamond Imports wishes to amend its Counterclaim, Diamond Imports shall file its First Amended Counterclaim no later than August 26, 2016. In addition, should Diamond Imports again name Vaghani as a counterdefendant, Diamond Imports must re-serve him with the summons and amended pleading. (4) In the event Diamond Imports does not amend within the time provided, the Counterclaim will proceed only as to the Fourth Cause of Action, and only as against Kapu Gems. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)
August 9, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON COUNTERDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court deems the matter appropriate for determination on the parties' respective written submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for August 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 9, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
July 19, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE (Dkt. Nos. 70 & 72). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on July 19, 2016. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 18, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AUTHORIZING MAGISTRATE JUDGE CORLEY TO AMEND PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 8, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; VACATING HEARING. Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery, and all further discovery matters, are referred to a Magistrate Judge to be heard and considered at the convenience of the assigned Magistrate Judge's calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 20, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON KALPESH VAGHANI'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIM FOR DAMAGES. A hearing on Vaghani's Motion to Dismiss shall be held on August 12, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 14, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON COUNTER-DEFENDANT KALPESH VAGHANI'S MOTION TO DISMISS DIAMOND IMPORTS, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIM FOR DAMAGES; CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS TO JULY 22, 2016. In light of the extensions granted, the hearing on the Motion to Dismiss is continued to July 22, 2016, the Court being unavailable on July 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 2, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON COUNTERDEFENDANT KALPESH VAGHANI'S MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing date for counterdefendant Kalpesh Vaghani's Motion to Dismiss, filed May 31, 2016, is continued from June 24, 2016, to July 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 2, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
April 12, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON COUNTERDEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The Court deems the matter appropriate for determination on the parties' respective written submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 14, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
January 21, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/21/2016. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016)
January 15, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND. To the extent defendants seek dismissal on the ground that plaintiffs lack the capacity to sue, the motion is denied. In all o ther respects, the motion is granted, and plaintiffs are afforded leave to amend their First (Account Stated), Second (Breach of Contract), and Third (Conversion) Causes of Action. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 15, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 1, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to the motion, the Court deems the matter appropriate for determination on the parties' respective submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for December 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
October 28, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. The hearing on defendants' Motion to Dismiss will be held on December 4, 2015. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 28, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015)
October 2, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall have an extension to October 23, 2015, to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Defendants shall have an extension to October 30, 2015, to reply to Pla intiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; a hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be held on November 13, 2015; and the Case Management Conference is hereby continued to January 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 28, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 28, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2015)
August 7, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE The application of Anthony Paduano is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapu Gems et al v. Diamond Imports, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kapu Gems
Represented By: Abe Lampart
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Represented By: Christine Ann Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kapu Gems,Ltd.
Represented By: Abe Lampart
Represented By: Anthony Paduano
Represented By: Christine Ann Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yair Yachdav
Represented By: Steven H. Bovarnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?