Leonard v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Francine Leonard
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 4:2015cv03536
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim Granting 21 Stipulation Re Attorney's Fees. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
March 17, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim Granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.(sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
August 27, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/27/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Scott J. Borrowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francine Leonard
Represented By: Katherine Rose Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?