Freitas et al v. Bounceback, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Angelina Freitas, Rebecca Lyon and Maresa Kendrick
Defendant: Bounceback, Inc., Check Connection, Inc., Stone Fence Holdings, Inc. and Gale Krieg
Case Number: 4:2015cv03560
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 52 Dismissing Entire Action. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/26/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
March 16, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Matter Pending Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2016)
November 6, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL NAMES AND CONTACT INFORMATION FOR PROPOSED CLASS MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/6/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
November 5, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 1/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/5/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
August 20, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/20/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas et al v. Bounceback, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Freitas
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lyon
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maresa Kendrick
Represented By: Susan S. Brown
Represented By: Karl Olson
Represented By: Michael Francis Ram
Represented By: Beth E. Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bounceback, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check Connection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Fence Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gale Krieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?