IN RE: ANGELA DELORES WARREN

Appellant: 5810-5816-5818 Mission Street Homeowners' Association
Appellee: Angela Deloris Warren
Trustee: Barry Milgrom and U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Case Number: 4:2015cv03655
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $13,991.17 as to 5810-5816-5818 Owners' Association, aka 5810-5816-5818 Homewoners' Association. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)(Original writ of execution mailed to counsel for appellee)
August 10, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 20 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Execution. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
May 17, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 13, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING BANKRUPTCY COURT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/13/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
December 8, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING SHOW CAUSE HEARING AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Court VACATES the Show Cause Hearing set for 12/11/2015 at 9:01 AM. Appellant Brief due no later than 12/21/2015. Appellee Brief no later than 2/8/2016. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/8/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015)
December 1, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 12/11/2015 09:01 AM. Show Cause Appellant Response due by 12/4/2015. Appellees may file response by 12/7/15 Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/2/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: ANGELA DELORES WARREN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: 5810-5816-5818 Mission Street Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Michael J.M. Brook
Represented By: William Allan Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Angela Deloris Warren
Represented By: Susan Jeanne Cofano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Barry Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?