Craig v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Robert Fred Craig
Defendant: Ron Davis, Elena Tootel and V. Brim
Case Number: 4:2015cv03664
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; STAY AND REERRAL TO MEDIATION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Certificate of Service attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying as moot 31 MOTION That This Be the Last Extension Given to V. Bri; denying in part 36 Motion. The motion for Appointment of Counsel and Discovery is denied. The request for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is granted. (Certificate of Service attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. (Certificate of Service Attached) Signed by Judge Phyllis J Hamilton on 8/1/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/3/15. (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED) (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fred Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elena Tootel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Brim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?