Tommy Dowdy et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Tommy Dowdy and Sharon Morris-Dowdy
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv03764
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 21 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 24 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016)
February 16, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re 17 MOTION for Discovery filed by Tommy Dowdy. Briefing due by 2/19/2016 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
December 16, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions for Judgment due 3/3/2016. Oppositions to Motions due 3/17/2016. Replies in Support of Motions due 3/31/2016. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tommy Dowdy et al v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Dowdy
Represented By: Mark Lewis Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Morris-Dowdy
Represented By: Mark Lewis Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?