Ramirez v. Apena Corp et al

Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Defendant: Apena Corp, Demetrios Giannis and Rose Giannis
Case Number: 4:2015cv03808
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 for Dismissal with Prejudice as to all Defendants filed by Irma Ramirez. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
April 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Demetrios Giannis. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016)
February 16, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2016. Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
November 25, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Joint Site Inspection filed by Irma Ramirez Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/25/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Apena Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Ramirez
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apena Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demetrios Giannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Giannis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?