Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. CB Equities, LLC,

Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: CB Equities, LLC and American Brokers Conduit Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv03809
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 89 Motion to Intervene and DENYING 96 Motion for Default Judgment. (jswlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
May 3, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing re 40 MOTION for Default Judgment, 59 Supplemental Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/3/2016. CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 67 . (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
May 2, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing in Support of Motion for Default Judgment re 40 MOTION for Default Judgment, 59 Supplemental Brief, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/02/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 7, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing in Support of 40 MOTION for Default Judgment and to provide exhibits for 32 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/7/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
December 4, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER requiring Supplemental Briefing re 11 MOTION for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall file supplemental briefing by 9:00 a.m. on 12/08/2015. Any opposition or statement of non-opposition is due no later than December 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/4/2015. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
November 3, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re CB Equities, LLC v. American Brokers Conduit Corporation, 12-05449-DMR; ORDER VACATING 11/5/2015 hearing on 11 Deutsche Bank's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/3/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
October 16, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Unusable Chambers Copies of 12 Declaration in Support, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, 14 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, 13 Declaration in Support, filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Plaintiff shall submit chambers copies in a format that is usable by the court no later than October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/16/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
September 29, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 11 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/29/2015. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. CB Equities, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Denetta Evelyn-Juanita Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Brokers Conduit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?