Signal Mutual Indemnity Association, Ltd. v. Dignity Health et al

Plaintiff: Signal Mutual Indemnity Association, Ltd.
Defendant: Dignity Health, Clement Jones and M. David Cohen
Case Number: 4:2015cv03818
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANTS ( 38 , 39 ) MOTIONS TO DISMISS.(terminating 40 Motion for Joinder). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
October 17, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation to Continue Hearings On Defendants' 38 , 39 Motions to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
July 19, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 13 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND (denying as moot 30 Motion for Leave to File). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signal Mutual Indemnity Association, Ltd. v. Dignity Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signal Mutual Indemnity Association, Ltd.
Represented By: Lindsay R McKasson
Represented By: Philip Ross Weltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?