Knaus et al v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: She Lee, Jianjia Yang, Yirui Wang, Seungkwon Choi, Kyeonghwa Kim, Nam Hoon Jo, Jing Feng, Xianmei Wang, Yu Zhou, Shinze He, Fujun Jiang, Bo Eun Han, Hongqin Li, Jie Huang, Tieshan Xi, Sangki Jeon, Limin Mao, Wen Zhang, Xumin Yang, Weijia Wang, Yi Zhang, Guofu Yang, Xiarong Wang, Miao Luo, Huamin Li, Shuai Wang, Jingxia Kang, Maricel Anino Knaus, Hechung Gu, Lilian Jin, Pingyuan Fu, Aiqing Zhang, Jie Zhang, Yi Qin, Joon Seok Noh, Yunxia Mao, Carl Knaus, Donghe Xia, Y.C., Yuan Zhang, Hui Cai, Na Young Han, Ye Rim Kim, Soon Ja Oh, Yiying Hou, Lijun Wu, Xiaomin Zhou, Haijun Xu, Juhua Zhu, Q.X., Patricia Xu, Nam Kyun Kim, Xuehong Hou, Lingxia Yang, Kailiang Wen, Fuhua Wang, Ji Eun Kim, Nianzhe Sun, Gaili Bai, Yongxiu Lin, Jianhong Xu, Aiqing Cao, Sung Lim Lee, Kee Seung Han, B.W., Kyoung Sook Kim, Dongliang Li, So Young Kim, Min Jeong Choi, Jianfang Tan, Ming Wu, Hyun Ju Lee, Sung Chul Shin, Zaixian Cao, Jing Wang, Eunn Yung Park, Qingxia Yang, Yan Zhang, Qingzeng Sun, Yi Gap Cho, Jiahui Tang, Xiaoqiang Mao and Nini Shao
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Petitioner: Asiana Airlines Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv03916
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (1148) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice of individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR as part of MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; granting (127) Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to individual case 4:15-cv-03916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 7, 2018 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE filed by The Boeing Company, Nini Shao, et al. (Strain, Donna) (Filed on 2/7/2018) Modified on 2/8/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2018 Filing 126 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, FEBRUARY 2, 2018 AT 9:01 AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (1141) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in related case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (1140) Motion To Correct Error in Record in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in related case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING AS TO CASE 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. The Compliance hearing set 1/19/2018 at 9:01 AM is CONTINUED to Friday, 2/2/2018 at 9:01 AM. Filing of a motion to correct the record due by 1/26/18. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 122 Joint Statement Re Failure to File Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal by Y.C., B.W., Q.X.. (Mendoza, Enid) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2018 Filing 121 Mail sent to Monica R. Kelly returned as undeliverable re (1126 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR, 120 in 4:15-cv-03916-YGR) Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court Staff. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 22, 2017 Filing 120 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF HUI CAI AND YUAN ZHANG'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (1118)Plaintiff Hui Cai and Yuan Zhang's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise re 4:15-cv-3916-YGR in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (1119) Administrative Motion of Plaintiff Hui Cai and Yuan Zhang to Partially File Records Under Seal as to 4:15-3916-YGR re MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
September 28, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #117 Order. Compliance hearing set for Friday, 1/19/2018 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 OMNIBUS ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE. All pending motion, case management and trial dates are vacated.Group 1 Cases 15-cv-2631-YGR, 15-cv-2633-YGR and 15-cv-3989-YGR set for Compliance hearing on Friday, October 6, 2017 at 9:01 AM. Group 2 Cases 14-cv-5603-YGR, 15-cv-2591-YGR, 15-cv-2594-YGR, 15-cv-2602-YGR, 15-cv-2617-YGR, 15-cv-2678-YGR, 15-cv-3370-YGR and 15-cv-3507-YGR set for Compliance hearing on Friday, October 27, 2017 at 9:01 AM.Group 3 Cases 14-cv-5510-YGR and 15-cv-3990-YGR set for Compliance hearing on Friday, October 27, 2017 at 9:01AM.Group 4 Case 15-cv-3916-YGR set for Compliance hearing on Friday, January 19, 2018 at 9:01 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/28/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Telephone Conference in 4:15-cv-3916-YGR held on 9/28/2017 as an individual case that is part of MDL 2497.Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Court Reporter: NOT REPORTED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2017)
July 17, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Donna Michelle Strain (Strain, Donna) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
March 10, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Anahit Samarjian for Defendant The Boeing Company (Samarjian, Anahit) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (709 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) Proposed Order filed by Asiana Airlines, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement re the status of settlement negotiations and all cases that remain on the Court's docket at that time to be filed by 4/28/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for Friday, January 13, 2017 is CONTINUED to Friday, 5/5/2017 10:00 AM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/12/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, JANUARY 13, 2017 AT 10:00AM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ON SCHEDULE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2017. Damages Fact Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for Friday, 1/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 29, 2016 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asiana Airlines Inc. re #109 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/21/2016.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/26/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (670) Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
August 11, 2016 Filing 107 ***DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ***ORDER GRANTING XINGYONG CHEN AND FUHUA WANG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (666) Plaintiffs Xingyong Chen and Fuhua Wang's Unoppposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (667) Plaintiff Xingyong Chen and Fuhua Wang's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 8, 2016 Filing 104 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION order for liens to be deemed abandoned filed by Asiana Airlines Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 supporting Stipulation, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
July 25, 2016 Filing 103 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTFF QINZENG SUN AND WEIMIN ZHU'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. *** UNDER SEAL*** (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (660)Plaintiff Qinzeng Sun and Weimin Zhu's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (661) Plaintiff Qinzeng Sun and Weimin Zhu's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and individual case 4:15-cv-3926-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (643) Motion to Dismiss the Claims of 15 Passengers in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and as to individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 99 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF HAIJUN XU AND WEN ZHANG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (544) Plaintiff Haijun Xu and Wen Zhang's Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR and in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (545) Plaintiff Haijun Xu and Wen Zhang's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR and in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 96 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF DONG LIANG LI AND XIAO HONG LI'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (548)Plaintiff Dong Liang Li and Xiao Hong Li's Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR and in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (549) Plaintiff Dong Liang Li and Xiao Hong Li's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR and in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (604) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of claims of the Plaintiffs listed in this document in case no. 4:15-cv-3916-YGR, which is part of the MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
May 6, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Re-Filing re #71 Order by Jiahui Tang (Attachments: #1 DE 71- Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise)(Mendoza, Enid) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE of Re-Filing re #52 Order by Sung Chul Shin (Attachments: #1 DE 52- Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise)(Mendoza, Enid) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE of Re-filing re #49 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Kee Seung Han (Attachments: #1 DE 49 - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise)(Mendoza, Enid) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Re-Filing re #55 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Eunn Yung Park (Attachments: #1 DE 55 - Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise)(Mendoza, Enid) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MIAO LUO AND YI QUIN'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE re (596 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) MOTION for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed by Miao Luo. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/2/2016. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 87 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JIE ZHANG AND JIANGUI LI'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 86 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LIJUN WU AND YING ZHANG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Filing 85 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff.ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MIAO LUO AND YI QIN'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (593) Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (594) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (590) Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (591) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and as to individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY. DISREGARD. SEE DKT. NO. 87 *** ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and as to individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016) Modified on 5/4/2016 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2016 (fs, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (597) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
April 21, 2016 Filing 78 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER Granting Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (571) Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (572) Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; in individual case 15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (556) Joint Stipulation to Permanently Lock, Withdraw and Re-file certain Docket Entries in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2016)
April 12, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Daniel Eric Lassen (Lassen, Daniel) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
March 9, 2016 Remark: Order Dkt. no. 73 terminated motions as WITHDRAWN at Dkt. nos. 64, 66, 67, 68 and 69;Dkt. nos. 59 and 60 are VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (526) Joint Stipulation to Withdraw Five Motions for Approval of Minor Settlement in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and re individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
March 7, 2016 Filing 72 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JIAHUI TANG AND JUN YANG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Under Seal Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )******* ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (517) Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and regarding individual case 4:15-cv-3916.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016) Modified on 4/15/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (518) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; and as to individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR..(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Miao Luo and Yi Qin's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 68 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Jie Zhang and Jianguo Li's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 67 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Haijun Xu and Wen Zhang's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 18, 2016 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Dong Liang Li and Xiao Hong Li's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER VACATING ORDERS GRANTING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE; SETTING HEARING ON MOTION. The Court sets a hearing on the motion (MDL Dkt. No. 479) to be held 3/15/2016 at 2:00pm. Court VACATES Orders to allow for appropriate briefing as to 501 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR, #63 in 4:15-cv-03916-YGR) Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court Staff, ( #62 in 4:15-cv-03916-YGR, 500 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 479 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) MOTION for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed by Yan Zhang. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/8/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 5, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE to Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 2/5/2016) Modified on 2/8/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2016 Filing 63 *******VACATED PER ORDER #65 ******* DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF YAN ZHANG AND YONGHUI YUAN'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE ***UNDER SEAL***. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016) Modified on 2/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 *******VACATED PER ORDER #65 ******* ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (479)Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016) Modified on 2/9/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )*******
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (480) Plaintiff Yan Zhang and Yonghui Yuan's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 3, 2016 Filing 60 ***THIS ORDER IS VACATED. SEE ORDER AT DKT. NO. 73*** DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff : ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF DONG LIANG LI AND XIAO HONG LI'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE *** UNDER SEAL*** (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (fs, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ***THIS ORDER IS VACATED. SEE ORDER AT DKT. NO. 73*** ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (481) Plaintiff Dong Liang Li and Xiao Hong Li's Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF). *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )*******
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (482) Plaintiffs Dong Liang Li and Xiao Hong Li's Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR and as to individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
December 28, 2015 Filing 57 Mail sent to Monica R. Kelly returned as undeliverable re (53 in 4:15-cv-03916-YGR, 452 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court Staff. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 56 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EUNN YUNG PARK AND BYOUNG HWEE LEE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )******* ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (436) Plaintiff Eunn Yung Park and Byoung Hwee Lee's Unopposed Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; and in case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 4/15/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (437) Plaintiff Eunn Yung Park and Byoung Hwee Lee's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and in case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 2, 2015 Filing 53 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: ORDER GRANTING ON PLAINTIFF SUNG CHUL SHIN AND HYON JUNG KWON MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )******* ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (434) Plaintiff Sung Chul Shin and Hyon Jung Kwon Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR ; and in case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) Modified on 4/15/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (435) Plaintiff Sung Chul Shin and Hyon Jung Kwon's Unopposed Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; and in case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 19, 2015 Filing 50 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff: ORDER GRANTING ON PLAINTIFF KEE SEUNG HAN AND KYOUNG SOOK KIM'S UOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 *******LOCKED PURSUANT TO ORDER (DOC. #75 )******* ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (402) Motion for Approval of Minor's Compromise in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015) Modified on 4/15/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (424) Administrative Motion to File Supplemental Brief Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPROVE MINOR'S COMPROMISE re (402 in 4:13-md-02497-YGR) Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed by Kyoung Sook Kim, Kee Seung Han. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/9/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (403) Administrative Motion to Partially File Records Under Seal in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (393) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff Aiqing Cao individually and in her representative capacity on behalf of her minor child M.L.(hereinafter plaintiff) in individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR as part of MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; granting (42) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff Aiqing Cao individually and in her representative capacity on behalf of her minor child M.L.(hereinafter plaintiff) as to the individual case 4:15-cv-3916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (394) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of the claims of plaintiffs Zaixian Cao and Pingyuan Fu in case 4:15-cv-3916 as individual case in MDL case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; granting (43) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of the claims of plaintiffs Zaixian Cao and Pingyuan Fu in case 4:15-cv-3916. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2015)
October 28, 2015 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Zaixian Cao and Pingyuan Fu filed by The Boeing Company. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2015 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Aiqing Cao, M.L filed by The Boeing Company. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 10/28/2015) Modified on 10/29/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting (377) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of individual case in case 4:13-md-02497-YGR; granting (40) Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to case 4:15-cv-03916-YGR. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by The Boeing Company. (Wall, Kaycie) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 39 Mail sent to Lewis S. Eidson returned as undeliverable re #38 Clerk's Notice. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 38 CLERK'S NOTICE re case transferred to this district from Illinois, Northern. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-00839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 27, 2015 Filing 36 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California the electronic record. (rm, )
August 27, 2015 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2497 ConditionalTransfer Order filed 08/27/2015. (rm, )
August 27, 2015 Filing 35 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California.Mailed notice(rm, )
August 13, 2015 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Individual Plaintiff Guo Fu Yang (Duany-Mendoza, Enid)
August 12, 2015 Filing 34 LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 14-1840 consisting of one volume of exhibits(rp, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 32 OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 6/26/2014; Decided 7/8/2015 in USCA case no. 14-1827. (lf, )
July 31, 2015 Filing 31 MANDATE of USCA dated 7/8/2015 regarding notice of appeal #15 ; USCA No. 14-1827: The judgment of the District Court is REVERSED, with costs, and this case is REMANDED with instructions to rescind the remand orders and transfer these cases to the Northern District of California for consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407, consistent with the decision of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (lf, )
April 10, 2015 Filing 30 MANDATE of USCA dated 4/2/2015 regarding notice of appeal #15 ; USCA No. 14-1827: IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b) only as to plaintiff-appellee Nini Shao. This appeal remains active for the other parties. (rb, )
April 10, 2015 Filing 29 LETTER from Seventh Circuit USCA no. 14-1827 record to be retained. (rb, )
April 3, 2015 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal OF INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFF NINI SHAO'S CLAIMS AGAINST THE BOEING COMPANY (Larson, Bates)
March 27, 2015 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The pro hac vice motions dated 4/24/2014 and 4/25/2014, [ECF Nos. 20 & 23], are granted nunc pro tunc.Mailed notice (wp, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 26 TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal #15 (USCA no. 14-1827). (kj, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 25 SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Boeing Company, The (Larson, Bates) (Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 4/29/2014, document contains wrong case number.) (tg, ).
April 25, 2014 Filing 24 PAYMENT by Gaili Bai, Hui Cai, Aiqing Cao, Zaixian Cao, Yi Gap Cho, Min Jeong Choi, Seungkwon Choi, Jing Feng, Pingyuan Fu, Hechung Gu, Bo Eun Han, Kee Seung Han, Na Young Han, Shinze He, Xuehong Hou, Yiying Hou, Jie Huang, Sangki Jeon, Fujun Jiang, Lilian Jin, Nam Hoon Jo, Jingxia Kang, Ji Eun Kim, Kyeonghwa Kim, Kyoung Sook Kim, Nam Kyun Kim, So Young Kim, Carl Knaus, Maricel Anino Knaus, Hyun Ju Lee, She Lee, Sung Lim Lee, Dongliang Li, Hongqin Li, Huamin Li, Yongxiu Lin, Miao Luo, Limin Mao, Xiaoqiang Mao, Yunxia Mao, Joon Seok Noh, Soon Ja Oh, Eunn Yung Park, Yi Qin, Nini Shao, Sung Chul Shin, Nianzhe Sun, Qingzeng Sun, Jianfang Tan, Jiahui Tang, Fuhua Wang, Jing Wang, Shuai Wang, Weijia Wang, Xianmei Wang, Xiarong Wang, Yirui Wang, Kailiang Wen, Lijun Wu, Ming Wu, Tieshan Xi, Donghe Xia, Haijun Xu, Jianhong Xu, Patricia Xu, Guofu Yang, Jianjia Yang, Lingxia Yang, Qingxia Yang, Xumin Yang, Aiqing Zhang, Jie Zhang, Wen Zhang, Yan Zhang, Yi Zhang, Yuan Zhang, Xiaomin Zhou, Yu Zhou, Juhua Zhu of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9426329. (Eidson, Lewis)
April 25, 2014 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eidson, Lewis)
April 24, 2014 Filing 22 CERTIFIED copy of order dated 4/24/2014 from the 7th Circuit regarding notice of appeal #15 ; Appellate case no. : 14-1825, 14-1827, 14-1830, 14-1831, 14-1832, 14-1837, 14-1838, 14-1839, 14-1840, 14-1841, 14-1842, 18-1843, 14-1844, 14-1847, 14-1848, and 14-1849. The following are before the court: 1. EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL, filed on April 14, 2014, by counsel for the appellant. 2. PLAINTIFFS-APPELLEES' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO BOEING'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL, filed on April 21, 2014, by counsel for the appellees. 3. PLAINTIFF-APPELLEES' MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL OR STRIKE ARGUMENT, filed on April 21, 2014, by counsel for the appellees. 4. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL, filed on April 21, 2014, by counsel for the appellant. IT IS ORDERED that the emergency motion for stay pending appeal is GRANTED. The transmission of the certified copies of the remand orders to the state court is STAYED pending resolution of the appeal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss is DENIED without prejudice to reconsideration by the merits panel. The parties' briefs must discuss appellate jurisdiction fully. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED briefing in the appeal is EXPEDITED and will proceed as follows: 1. The consolidated brief and required short appendix of the appellant are due no later than May 14, 2014. 2. The joint consolidated response brief of the appellees is due no later than June 4, 2104. 3. The consolidated reply brief of the appellant, if any, is due no later than June 13, 2014. No extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Oral argument in this matter will be set by separate court order. (ph, )
April 24, 2014 Filing 21 PAYMENT by Gaili Bai of Pro Hac Fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9421059. (Mendoza, Enid)
April 24, 2014 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mendoza, Enid)
April 15, 2014 Filing 19 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #15 ; USCA Case No. 14-1827. (td, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 18 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #15 . Notified counsel. (kj, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #15 . (kj, )
April 15, 2014 Filing 16 DOCKETING Statement by Boeing Company, The regarding notice of appeal #15 (Larson, Bates)
April 15, 2014 Filing 15 NOTICE of appeal by Boeing Company, The regarding orders #14 Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0752-9392590. (Larson, Bates)
April 11, 2014 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The parties have stipulated that the jurisdictional issues in this case are the same as those in 13 C 7418. For the reasons discussed in the Courts decisions dated December 16, 2013 and April 11, 2014, Plaintiffs motion to remand #6 is granted. Defendants motion to set a briefing schedule #10 is denied as moot.Mailed notice (wp, )
March 20, 2014 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 02/19/2014 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, 312-702-8865, judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (walsh, Judy)
February 19, 2014 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Motion to remand #6 is entered and continued until the court rules on the motion to reconsider. Mailed notice (wp, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Bates McIntyre Larson for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #10 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/19/2014 at 09:39 AM. (Larson, Bates)
February 14, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Boeing Company, The to set a briefing schedule (Larson, Bates)
February 14, 2014 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Boeing Company, The regarding answer to complaint #8 (Larson, Bates)
February 13, 2014 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Boeing Company, The(Larson, Bates)
February 13, 2014 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Boeing Company, The by Kathleen A. Stetsko (Stetsko, Kathleen)
February 11, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Gaili Bai, Hui Cai, Aiqing Cao, Zaixian Cao, Yi Gap Cho, Min Jeong Choi, Seungkwon Choi, Jing Feng, Pingyuan Fu, Hechung Gu, Bo Eun Han, Kee Seung Han, Na Young Han, Shinze He, Xuehong Hou, Yiying Hou, Jie Huang, Sangki Jeon, Fujun Jiang, Lilian Jin, Nam Hoon Jo, Jingxia Kang, Ji Eun Kim, Kyeonghwa Kim, Kyoung Sook Kim, Nam Kyun Kim, So Young Kim, Carl Knaus, Maricel Anino Knaus, Hyun Ju Lee, She Lee, Sung Lim Lee, Dongliang Li, Hongqin Li, Huamin Li, Yongxiu Lin, Miao Luo, Limin Mao, Xiaoqiang Mao, Yunxia Mao, Joon Seok Noh, Soon Ja Oh, Eunn Yung Park, Yi Qin, Nini Shao, Sung Chul Shin, Nianzhe Sun, Qingzeng Sun, Jianfang Tan, Jiahui Tang, Fuhua Wang, Jing Wang, Shuai Wang, Weijia Wang, Xianmei Wang, Xiarong Wang, Yirui Wang, Kailiang Wen, Lijun Wu, Ming Wu, Tieshan Xi, Donghe Xia, Haijun Xu, Jianhong Xu, Patricia Xu, Guofu Yang, Jianjia Yang, Lingxia Yang, Qingxia Yang, Xumin Yang, Aiqing Zhang, Jie Zhang, Wen Zhang, Yan Zhang, Yi Zhang, Yuan Zhang, Xiaomin Zhou, Yu Zhou, Juhua Zhu to remand (Kelly, Monica)
February 11, 2014 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Gaili Bai, Hui Cai, Aiqing Cao, Zaixian Cao, Yi Gap Cho, Min Jeong Choi, Seungkwon Choi, Jing Feng, Pingyuan Fu, Hechung Gu, Bo Eun Han, Kee Seung Han, Na Young Han, Shinze He, Xuehong Hou, Yiying Hou, Jie Huang, Sangki Jeon, Fujun Jiang, Lilian Jin, Nam Hoon Jo, Jingxia Kang, Ji Eun Kim, Kyeonghwa Kim, Kyoung Sook Kim, Nam Kyun Kim, So Young Kim, Carl Knaus, Maricel Anino Knaus, Hyun Ju Lee, She Lee, Sung Lim Lee, Dongliang Li, Hongqin Li, Huamin Li, Yongxiu Lin, Miao Luo, Limin Mao, Xiaoqiang Mao, Yunxia Mao, Joon Seok Noh, Soon Ja Oh, Eunn Yung Park, Yi Qin, Nini Shao, Sung Chul Shin, Nianzhe Sun, Qingzeng Sun, Jianfang Tan, Jiahui Tang, Fuhua Wang, Jing Wang, Shuai Wang, Weijia Wang, Xianmei Wang, Xiarong Wang, Yirui Wang, Kailiang Wen, Lijun Wu, Ming Wu, Tieshan Xi, Donghe Xia, Haijun Xu, Jianhong Xu, Patricia Xu, Guofu Yang, Jianjia Yang, Lingxia Yang, Qingxia Yang, Xumin Yang, Aiqing Zhang, Jie Zhang, Wen Zhang, Yan Zhang, Yi Zhang, Yuan Zhang, Xiaomin Zhou, Yu Zhou, Juhua Zhu by Monica R. Kelly (Kelly, Monica)
February 7, 2014 MAILED notice of removal letter to counsel of record. (ph, )
February 6, 2014 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Daniel Martin. (lcw, )
February 6, 2014 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Boeing Company (Larson, Bates)
February 6, 2014 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Larson, Bates)
February 6, 2014 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates)
February 6, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2014 L 000541) filed by The Boeing Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9175843. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Larson, Bates)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knaus et al v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: She Lee
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianjia Yang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yirui Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seungkwon Choi
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyeonghwa Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nam Hoon Jo
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing Feng
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xianmei Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yu Zhou
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shinze He
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fujun Jiang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bo Eun Han
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongqin Li
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jie Huang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tieshan Xi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sangki Jeon
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Limin Mao
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wen Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xumin Yang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weijia Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guofu Yang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiarong Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miao Luo
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huamin Li
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shuai Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingxia Kang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricel Anino Knaus
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hechung Gu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilian Jin
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pingyuan Fu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiqing Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jie Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Qin
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joon Seok Noh
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yunxia Mao
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Knaus
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donghe Xia
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Y.C.
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuan Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hui Cai
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Na Young Han
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ye Rim Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soon Ja Oh
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yiying Hou
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lijun Wu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaomin Zhou
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haijun Xu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juhua Zhu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q.X.
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Xu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nam Kyun Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuehong Hou
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lingxia Yang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kailiang Wen
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fuhua Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ji Eun Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nianzhe Sun
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaili Bai
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yongxiu Lin
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianhong Xu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiqing Cao
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung Lim Lee
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kee Seung Han
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.W.
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyoung Sook Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongliang Li
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: So Young Kim
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Min Jeong Choi
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianfang Tan
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ming Wu
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyun Ju Lee
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung Chul Shin
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zaixian Cao
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing Wang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunn Yung Park
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qingxia Yang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Zhang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qingzeng Sun
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yi Gap Cho
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiahui Tang
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Represented By: Enid Duany Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaoqiang Mao
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nini Shao
Represented By: Lewis Shelton Eidson, Jr
Represented By: Monica R. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Donna Michelle Strain
Represented By: Daniel Eric Lassen
Represented By: Anahit Samarjian
Represented By: Kaycie Lynn Wall
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Asiana Airlines Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer J. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?