Solayman v. Prudential Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Timirise Solayman
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv04210
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
February 25, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/25/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
December 14, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
December 7, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 15 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solayman v. Prudential Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timirise Solayman
Represented By: Paul Randall Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?