East Bay Law v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: East Bay Law
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv04257
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Hon. Thelton E. Henderson on 02/29/16. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
January 25, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/25/2016. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 6, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 1/25/2016 at 10:00 AM. Written response, if any, due by 1/15/2016. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/06/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2016)
November 25, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 MOTION to Remand. Reset Briefing Schedule for 15 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, for Summary Judgment: Plaintiff's Opposition due by 12/9/2015; Defendant's Reply due by 12/16/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/25/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
October 26, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/26/15. (tehlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East Bay Law v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Law
Represented By: Andrew Wagdy Shalaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brian H. Chun
Represented By: Africa E. Davidson
Represented By: Africa Evangeline Davidson
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?