Conklin v. Equifax Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Melissa Conklin
Defendant: Equifax Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and American Express Bank, FSB
Case Number: 4:2015cv04315
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 3/25/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/18/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
December 9, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 22 Motion to Appear by Telephone ; Continuing Case Management Conference; Setting Compliance Hearing. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
December 4, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT AMERICAN EXPRESS re 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Melissa Conklin, American Express Bank, FSB terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/4/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin v. Equifax Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Conklin
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ramon Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Bank, FSB
Represented By: Frederick Alan Haist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?