Campanelli v. Image First Uniform Rental Service, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kyle L. Campanelli
Defendant: Image First Uniform Rental Service, Inc., Image First Healthcare Laundry Specialists, Inc. and Image First of California, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04456
Filed: September 28, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2017 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting in part 77 Motion to Stay; denying 75 Motion for Relief from Non-Dispositive Magistrate Judge's Order. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
May 18, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Briefing on 75 MOTION for Relief from Non-Dispositive Pre-Trial Order of a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 05/18/2017. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
September 12, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
July 1, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 43 Motion to Compel.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 43 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/08/2016. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
March 30, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiff's Request for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/30/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
December 29, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/29/2015. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2015)
November 6, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Order Reassigning Case. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campanelli v. Image First Uniform Rental Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle L. Campanelli
Represented By: Brian J. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image First Uniform Rental Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image First Healthcare Laundry Specialists, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Image First of California, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?