Elida Calderon et al v. Victor Juan Untiveros et al

Plaintiff: Elida Calderon, Elizabel Hernandez and Fair Housing of Marin
Defendant: Victor Juan Untiveros and 4th & Elm, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv04523
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Application and Stipulation for Issuance of Order Dismissing Action Following Settlement filed by 4th & Elm, LLC, Elizabel Hernandez, Elida Calderon, Fair Housing of Marin, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/4/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2016)
April 22, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC re 30 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Notice of Settlement filed by 4th & Elm, LLC, Victor Juan Untiveros, Elizabel Hernandez, Elida Calderon, Fair Housing of Marin Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/22/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2016)
April 5, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Application and Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings filed by 4th & Elm, LLC, Elizabel Hernandez, Elida Calderon, Fair Housing of Marin Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/5/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elida Calderon et al v. Victor Juan Untiveros et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elida Calderon
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabel Hernandez
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair Housing of Marin
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Juan Untiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4th & Elm, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?