Liu v. City of San Bruno et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Liu
Defendant: City of San Bruno and County of San Mateo
Case Number: 4:2015cv04581
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT ENE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/6/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
February 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER for Jury Trial by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 19, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ENE by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liu v. City of San Bruno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Liu
Represented By: Che Lewellyn Hashim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?