Alexander Mahimer v. Matson Navigation Co.

Plaintiff: Alexander Mahimer
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv04619
Filed: October 6, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/8/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
September 5, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/05/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2016)
January 11, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/11/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Mahimer v. Matson Navigation Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Mahimer
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?