Levi Strauss & Co., v. Aqua Dynamics Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.,
Defendant: Aqua Dynamics Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv04718
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/24/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER GRANTING 101 MOTION TO CONFIRM, DENYING 108 MOTION TO VACATE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 102 , 103 STIPULATION AMENDING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE re 101 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award. Responses due by 6/12/2020. Replies due by 6/26/2020. Motion Hearing reset for 7/15/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
November 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William H. Orrick granting 78 Stipulation. Case Management Conference reset for 6/12/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CERTIFY FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Hon. William H. re: 62 Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE HEARING MOTION TO CERTIFY OCTOBER 18, 2016 ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND 2) CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Reset Deadlines as 62 MOTION: Responses due by 5/17/2017. Replies due by 5/24/2 017. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2017. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2017. Case Management Conference continued to 6/7/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 STIPULATION to Continue CMC and Deadline/Hearing on Motion to Certify. Reply due by 5/17/2017. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. (Case Management Statement due 5/17/2017.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/10/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Stipulation continuing deadlines as to 62 MOTION re 59 Order on Motion to Compel. Response due by 1/18/2017. Reply due by 1/25/2017. Motion Hearing continued to 2/1/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco be fore Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Conference continued to 2/1/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/28/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Order Granting 45 Motion to Compel Arbitration by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER ON 57 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Case Conference continued to 11/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/04/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER - Case Management Conference continued to 10/18/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/11/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/31/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DISMISS OR STAY PENDING ARBITRATION - Unless the parties agree otherwise, they shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to conduct discov ery on the non-signatory standing issue, and Aqua shall file any motion to compel arbitration no more than 15 days thereafter. Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/06/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION STAYING ARBITRATION PROCEEDING re 31 STIPULATION. The Arbitration is stayed until this Court rules on Aqua Dynamics' motion to dismiss or stay this action. The hearing on LS&Co.'s motion for preliminary injunction now scheduled for March 30 is vacated. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/01/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - 26 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order will be treated as a motion for preliminary injunction. Response due by 3/2/2016. Reply due by 3/9/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/16/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION TO 1) CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RULE 26 DISCLOSURES 2) EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 3) WITHDRAW PENDING MOTION TO DISMISS; AND ORDER THEREON re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CA SE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco (Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2016). Motion Hearing (as to Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint to be filed 2/19/2016) set for 3/30/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/22/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RULE 26 DISCLOSURES ORDER THERON - Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Case Management Statement due by 2/23/2016.) Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/22/2015. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi Strauss & Co., v. Aqua Dynamics Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.,
Represented By: Robert Allan McFarlane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Dynamics Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?