Natalie Sramek v. California Highway Patrol et al

Plaintiff: Natalie Sramek
Defendant: California Highway Patrol, Joseph Farrow, Sean Harrington and Robert Hazelwood
Case Number: 4:2015cv04873
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 18 Stipulation OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
August 9, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Docket No. 16 Granting Request to Vacate CMC. Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 8/9/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016)
June 3, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO RESPOND Status Report due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/3/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2016)
April 12, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 9 Stipulated Request to Continue CMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
January 15, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 15, 2016. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 14, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 4 Stipulation Moving Initial CMC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natalie Sramek v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Sramek
Represented By: Richard Allen Madsen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?