Schoenmann v. Salevouris et al

Plaintiff: E. Lynn Schoenmann
Defendant: Billie Z. Salevouris and David M. Raynal
Case Number: 4:2015cv05193
Filed: November 12, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/24/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
March 30, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Complete Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 30, 2016. (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2016)
March 9, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
January 12, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING [1-1] Motion for Withdrawal of Reference and 6 Request for Status Conference. Status Report due by 2/26/2016. Status Conference set for 3/4/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 12, 2016. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoenmann v. Salevouris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. Lynn Schoenmann
Represented By: Dale L. Bratton
Represented By: Jaemin Chang
Represented By: Jack Conrad-Charles Praetzellis
Represented By: Michael Adam Sweet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Z. Salevouris
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Raynal
Represented By: John H. MacConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?