Card v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Joeshana Tamika Card
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2015cv05201
Filed: November 13, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 19 Stipulation For Extension of Time. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
March 28, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. Motions due by 5/9/2016. Cross Motions due by 6/6/2016. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
November 30, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STATEMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/30/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Card v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joeshana Tamika Card
Represented By: Steven Gilberto Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Henry Liheng Chi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?