Heifetz v. Cheese Steak Shop, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shelby Gail Heifetz
Defendant: Cheese Steak Shop, Inc. and MMI Properties, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv05219
Filed: November 14, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cheese Steak Shop, Inc.]. Case Management Statement due by 4/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/9/2016. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 22, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 21 STIPULATION & REQUEST BY THE PARTIES FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING GENERAL ORDER 56 TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE FOR JOINT INSPECTION TO ACCOMMODATE THE PARTIES AND THEIR COUNSEL.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
January 11, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heifetz v. Cheese Steak Shop, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Gail Heifetz
Represented By: Irakli M. Karbelashvili
Represented By: Irene Lenislav Karbelashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheese Steak Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMI Properties, LLC
Represented By: Horace W. Green
Represented By: Tonya Draeger Hubinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?