Fieser v. Van Ness et al
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Fieser
Defendant: W. Denman Van Ness, William K. Bowes, Jr., Peter Barton Hutt, Joseph M. Limber, Kelvin M. Neu, Patrick J. Scannon, John Varian, Timothy P. Walbert, Paul D. Rubin, Jack L. Wyszomierski and Xoma Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv05236
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Timothy P. Walbert. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 6, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Pat rick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Timothy P. Walbert. Case Management Statement due by 12/4/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 10, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Pat rick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Timothy P. Walbert. Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 3, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying the Action filed by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Timothy P. Walbert. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Reschedule Case Management Conference [CORRECTED] file d by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporation, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Timothy P. Walbert Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/21/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/13/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL RE CASE NO. 15-cv-5429-HSG AND ORDER RESCINDING RELATED CASE ORDER RE CASE NOS. 15-cv-3425-HSG and 15-cv-5236-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/24/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Reschedule Case Management Conference. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 15-3425. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 01/12/2016. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by Joseph M. Limber, John Varian, Paul D. Rubin, W. Denman Van Ness, Xoma Corporatio n, Kelvin M. Neu, Peter Barton Hutt, Patrick J. Scannon, Jack L. Wyszomierski, William K. Bowes, Jr., Deborah A. Fieser, Timothy P. Walbert Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2016 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/11/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fieser v. Van Ness et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Fieser
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Denman Van Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Bowes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Barton Hutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Limber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin M. Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Scannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Varian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. Walbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul D. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack L. Wyszomierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xoma Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?