Daie v. Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan et al

Plaintiff: Ed Daie
Defendant: Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan, Intel Corporation, Reed Group and Claim Appeal Fiduciary Services
Case Number: 4:2015cv05255
Filed: November 17, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 79 STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/8/2016. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs and Sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 1, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 77 JOINT MOTION RE HEARING. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs and Sanctions: Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Status Report due by 12/8/2016 at noon. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/1/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
August 10, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 1, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SEEKING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/1/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 14, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 57 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
July 12, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 55 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 22, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPPOSITION BRIEF, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 7/8/2016. Replies due by 7/15/2016. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/22/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
April 25, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXTENSION by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Administrative Motion for extension.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 13, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS AND TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFS, Motions terminated: 34 Motions due by 4/28/2016.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/13/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
February 11, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/11/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016)
December 31, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 .(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2015)
December 7, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/7/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
November 30, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/15. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 24, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/24/15. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daie v. Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Daie
Represented By: Ray Francis Bourhis
Represented By: Eric B Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Douglas G.A. Johnston
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Douglas G.A. Johnston
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Group
Represented By: Douglas G.A. Johnston
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claim Appeal Fiduciary Services
Represented By: Douglas G.A. Johnston
Represented By: Nancy Baughman Pridgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?