Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers et al v. Construction Materials Testing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Richard Piombo and Russell E. Burns
Defendant: Construction Materials Testing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv05325
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1451 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER LIFTING THE STAY, REOPENING CASE, AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR AUGUST 16, 2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2017 at 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on July 12, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to 47 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/18/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER To Submit Supplemental Briefing in Support of 20 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS TESTING, INC.; AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Richard Piombo, Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Russell E. Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/15/16. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to Submit Supplemental Briefing in Support of 20 MOTION for Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/11/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re: Hearing on MOTION for Default Judgment 20 . The hearing noticed for July 28, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. remains on calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/05/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 27 Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Motion for Default Judgment; Continuing Hearing on 20 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment and Setting Briefing Schedule: Opposition deadline by 7/1/2016; Reply deadline by 7/8/2016; and Motion Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment set for 7/28/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/27/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Initial CMC. The Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/2/2016 01:30 PM has been VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file a Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant or a status report by 4/18/2016. Plaintiffs shall serve the Defendant with a copy of this Clerk's Notice and file a proof of service with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/18/2016. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers et al v. Construction Materials Testing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Plan for Pension Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Anjuli Maria Cargain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Piombo
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Anjuli Maria Cargain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Shaamini Babu
Represented By: Anjuli Maria Cargain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Construction Materials Testing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?