Pickles et al v. Kate Spade and Company

Plaintiff: Gaylia Pickles and Donna Vandiver
Defendant: Kate Spade and Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv05329
Filed: November 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying 48 Motion to Dismiss. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
May 5, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND. Second Amended Complaint due by 5/26/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/5/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2016)
December 2, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel re 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Gaylia Pickles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/2/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickles et al v. Kate Spade and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaylia Pickles
Represented By: Ari Yale Basser
Represented By: Kevin K. Eng
Represented By: David Samuel Markun
Represented By: Edward Scott Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vandiver
Represented By: Michelle Eddington
Represented By: Che Dawn Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Spade and Company
Represented By: Mark A Ozzello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?