H. et al v. Brentwood Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: H. and Lynda Holmes
Defendant: Brentwood Unified School District, Liz Ybarra, Lisa Karlskind, Mindy Mclaughlin, Concepta Joseph and Jaye Lynn Thompson
Case Number: 4:2015cv05461
Filed: November 30, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2016 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after hearing. All discovery stayed until 2/7/17 case management conference. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 11/10/2016. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 23, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Chhabria re 53 Discovery Letter Brief (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2016)
March 29, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/29/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/11/2016. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 3/8/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
December 9, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRALFOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/9/2015. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. Brentwood Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Ybarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Karlskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mindy Mclaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concepta Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaye Lynn Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.
Represented By: Nicole Hodge Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Holmes
Represented By: Nicole Hodge Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?