Yue v. MSC Software Corporation

Plaintiff: Dongxiao Yue
Defendant: MSC Software Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv05526
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 47 Administrative Motion to Extend Discovery Period; finding as moot 48 Administrative Motion for Clarification. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 20, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 45 Letter filed by Dongxiao Yue Regarding Discovery Period for Copyright Claims. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 07/20/2016. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 15, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 37 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and to Lift Restriction on Discovery Period.(pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
March 14, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/14/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
March 9, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 30 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2016)
February 24, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 17 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)
December 21, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/21/15. Certificate of Service attached. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yue v. MSC Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dongxiao Yue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSC Software Corporation
Represented By: Liwen Arius Mah
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?