Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund et al v. Front Range Finishes, LLC

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund and Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Defendant: Front Range Finishes, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv05528
Filed: December 3, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL re 32 Notice OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE ALL UPCOMING DATES AND DEADLINES filed by Front Range Finishes, LLC. Stipulation of Dismissal or Statement due by 8/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
April 15, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER FURTHER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
March 17, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund, Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/20/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
January 12, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER relating this case to Resilient Floor Covering Pension Funds, et al. v. Alpine Design Interiors, Inc. (10-cv-730 EDL) by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund et al v. Front Range Finishes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Represented By: Donna Lynn Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resilient Floor Covering Pension Fund
Represented By: Donna Lynn Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Range Finishes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?