Milne v. Sears Holdings Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Harley Milne
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation and HireRight, LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv05551
Filed: December 4, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Deadline to add parties or amend the pleadings 7/1/16. Deadline to complete private mediation 7/31/16. Fact discovery cut-off 10/28/16. Expert disclosures 11/18/16. Expert rebuttal 12/9/16. Expert discovery cut-off 12/23/16 . Deadline to file dispositive motions 1/20/17. Pretrial conference statement due 3/28/17. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 5/1/2017 - 5/4/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 27, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016)
April 26, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SEARS HOLDINGS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
March 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 25 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sears Holdings Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
February 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER NOTING DISMISSAL re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Harley Milne. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 18, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR filed by Sears Holdings Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milne v. Sears Holdings Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harley Milne
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Represented By: Megan D Yelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Brittany A. Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HireRight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?