Marentes et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Vincent Castillo Marentes and Liudmila Bichegkueva
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv05616
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 39 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as Moot 67 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying as Moot 71 Defendant's Administrative Motion to File a Sur-Reply. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2016)
August 25, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 44 , 57 Discovery Dispute Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
August 5, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court INTERIM ORDER re 44 Discovery Report No. 1. Plaintiffs' response due by 8/9/2016. Plaintiffs to append to their portion of the report the subpoenas at issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/5/2016. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
June 29, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/29/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requesting Statement from Defendant and Order Regarding Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/28/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Requiring Parties to File Updated Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 06/24/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
April 7, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Regarding Application of Colorado River Abstention. Signed by Judge Lucy Koh on 04/07/2016. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
December 14, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/14/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marentes et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Castillo Marentes
Represented By: Jon-Marc Dobrin
Represented By: Jordan S. Stanzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liudmila Bichegkueva
Represented By: Jon-Marc Dobrin
Represented By: Jordan S. Stanzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Lauren M. Case
Represented By: Stephen M. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?