San Francisco Baykeeper v. Taylor

Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Defendant: James F. Taylor
Case Number: 4:2015cv05825
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Notice (Other) filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/20/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 18, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Notice (Other) filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/18/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
June 24, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES, AND TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. (CORRECTS DATE OF CONTINUED CMC) Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/24/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016) Modified on 6/24/2016 (rmm2S, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Notice (Other) filed by San Francisco Baykeeper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/26/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2016)
March 24, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/24/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2016)
February 24, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES. Case Management Statement due by 4/28/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/5/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2016. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: San Francisco Baykeeper v. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Baykeeper
Represented By: Nicole Chiyeko Sasaki
Represented By: George Matthew Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?