Russel I Kassman v. JP Morgan Chase Bank

Plaintiff: Russel I. Kassman
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 4:2015cv05873
Filed: December 21, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2017 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on June 26, 2017. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 1, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requesting Response from Defendant re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/1/2016.(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016)
May 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 33 ; Plaintiff may file an opposition to the Motion to Dismiss 23 or First Amended Complaint by May 18, 2016. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by May 25, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/13/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016)
May 11, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE to Plaintiff Kassman for failure to response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 23 . Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2016. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/11/2016. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russel I Kassman v. JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: William Joseph Idleman
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel I. Kassman
Represented By: David Marvin Wiseblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?