Allen Buckingham v. Bank of America Corp., Inc.

Plaintiff: Allen Buckingham, II
Defendant: Bank of America Corp., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv06344
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2017 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT [#96]; ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS [#92] (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
March 9, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND JOINT STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND RELEASE OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION CLAIMS AND TO CORRECT RECORD GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/9/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
April 7, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to Private ADR. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/30/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/7/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
February 17, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/17/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen Buckingham v. Bank of America Corp., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Buckingham, II
Represented By: Eduard R Meleshinsky
Represented By: Bryan Jeffrey Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?