In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation
Plaintiff: Jayne Constanzo, Susan Webster-Shultz, Michelle Behren, Ariella Vasquez, Gary Sherman, Jennifer Cole, Robert Ravencamp, Donald Gearhart, Russ Takle, Travis Palmer, Keng Gee, Dan Onken, Jim Kopps, Joseph Guerra, David Wood, Mary Jane Barbosa, Wendy Duran, Liangfang Zhao, Richard Krause, Richard Brooks, Sonia Ferezan, Ross M. Babbitt, Herbert Phillips, Vincent Wong, Christopher Hall, Ryan Kemper, Jennifer Davis, Ray Schmalzer, Elizabeth Pratt, Sterling International Consulting Group, Kyle Youngs, Danielle Rougier, Heather Hare, Austin Ardman, Douglas Irwin, Ivan Wu, Rajkumar Kothapa, Allan Bogh, Amanda Williams, Thomas Carney, Gabe Duran, Neeraj Kalra, Eric Moretti, Michael Morici, Ryan Tuckerman, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Chris Shouts, Edward Dressel, John Whittle, Lukas Pick, Ricardo Alaniz, Dien Phan, Jessica N. Bennett, Ken Martini, Kate Woods, Nagasubrahmanyam kummaragunta, John Levenhagen, Joel Foster, Nick Thweatt, Nate Talley, Michael Reinert, Lauren Dannheim, ThomaS Lucas, Connie Supernault, Richard Seedroff, Arul Louis, Liz Edwards, Marie Wilson, Michael Simonoff, Jose Hidalgo, Christopher Dunn, Rhonda Estrella, Dennis Hasty, Branden Hayden, Alice Spalitta, Stanley D Johnson, Jill Cazaubon, David Hunter, Dmitriy Khazak, Patrick Johnson, Nikolas Theriot, Russell Wood, Robert Qakish, Susan Tam, Bill Cullifer, Michele Large, Tina Richman, Matthew Kelso, Trevor Murdock, Thomas Behrendt, Zachary Stein, Brian Gutterman, Ryan Baumgartner, JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's, Sam Ellis, Beatriz Davis, Tom Miller, Sandra Allen, Susan Webster Schultz, Hank Baumer, Thomas Kim, Alan Woyt, Candace Rose, Laura Burns, Thomas Wilson and Zeshan Sheikh
Defendant: Lenovo Inc., Lenovo Group Limited and Superfish, Inc.
In Re: In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation
Case Number: 4:2015md02624
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information to be in effect Re: #266 Notice of Change of Address filed by Plaintiffs (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 266 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Krasne Levine (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING the Clerk to administratively close the following member cases, in light of the #258 global settlement filed in lead case 4:15-md-02624: 4:15-cv-02345; 4:15-cv-02783; 4:15-cv-02784; 4:15-cv-02785; 4:15-cv-02786; 4:15-cv-02787; 4:15-cv-02789; 4:15-cv-02790; 4:15-cv-02791; 4:15-cv-02792. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 264 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Further telephone settlement discussions held on May 31, 2019. Co-lead plaintiffs' counsel advised that the allocation matter is resolved. (Not Reported) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 263 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference regarding allocation of fees among Plaintiff co-lead counsel held on 5/29/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 00:45)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Elizabeth Kramer; Jonathan Levine; Elizabeth Pritzker.Attorney for Defendant: Eric Buescher. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2019)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #261 Stipulation or Referral to Magistrate Judge Corley Re Allocation of Attorneys' Fees. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 261 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Referral to Magistrate Judge re Allocation of Attorneys' Fees filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Sterling International Consulting Group, Alan Woyt, Susan Webster Shultz. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2019 Filing 260 FINAL JUDGMENT RE Docket No. #259 . ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 259 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #258 Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Superfish, Inc., Lenovo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/6/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #248 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND #249 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 22, 2019 Filing 257 Supplemental Brief in Support of #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/22/2019) Modified on 4/23/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2019 Filing 256 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2019. Total Time in Court: 10 Minutes. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. Plaintiff Attorney: Elizabeth Kramer; Jonathan Levine and Eric Buescher. Defendant Attorney: Christina Goodrich. Plaintiffs motion for final approval of class action settlement and motion for attorneys fees (docket nos. #248 and #249 ) are argued and submitted by the parties. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to submit a supplemental brief by April 22nd citing cases from this District where the court held that 30% was reasonable for attorneys fees in circumstances factually similar to the current action. Once the supplemental brief is received, the motions will be deemed submitted on the papers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 255 Letter from CRD sent to the Settlement Administrator Re Docket No. #253 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 253 REPLY (re #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards, #248 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements ) filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andy Morrison, #2 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 254 OBJECTIONS to re #248 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements by Carrie Bowden (Pepper). (Attachments: #1 Card, #2 Envelope)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 252 Statement of Non-Opposition re #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards, #248 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements filed byLenovo Inc.. (Related document(s) #249 , #248 ) (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 251 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Noel Goodrich (Goodrich, Christina) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 15, 2019 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting declarations to the Motion. Re: #250 Declaration in Support #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards #248 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 250 Declaration of of Joint Class Counsel in Support of #249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards, #248 MOTION for Settlement Approval filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #249 , #248 ) (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 249 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses, and Service Awards filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/28/2019. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Krause, #2 Declaration of John Whittle, #3 Declaration of Jessica Bennett, #4 Declaration of Robert Ravencamp, #5 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 2/28/2019. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, #2 Declaration of Brian Buckley, #3 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/14/2019) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2019 Filing 247 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Jessica N. Bennett (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: In the future, please make sure your documents correctly reflect the Court's location as the OAKLAND DIVISION, not S an Jose. Re: #246 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica N. Bennett (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 246 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric James Buescher (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #244 Stipulation Re Docket No. #243 Order on Motion for Settlement regarding Schedule. Motions due by 2/14/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 244 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #243 Order on Motion for Settlement regarding Schedule filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Lenovo Inc., Sonia Ferezan, Alan Woyt, Sterling International Consulting Group, Susan Webster-Shultz, and JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 11/28/2018) Modified on 11/29/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING #230 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
October 15, 2018 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Counsel must update personal profile for change of contact information to be in effect. Re: #242 Notice of Change of Address filed by Richard Krause, John Whittle, Robert Ravencamp, Jessica N. Bennett (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 242 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andre Michel Mura (Mura, Andre) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 241 NOTICE by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle of Change of Firm Name (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 240 ERRATA re #231 Declaration in Support,, by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A Lenovo Long Form Notice (revised))(Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 239 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2018. Total Time in Court: 9 Minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. Plaintiff Attorney: Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Kramer and Stephanie Biehl. Defendant Attorney: Daniel Stephenson. Plaintiffs motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (docket no. #230 ) is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 238 REPLY (re #230 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements ) filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/1/2018) Modified on 8/2/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2018 Filing 237 Statement of Non-Opposition re #230 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements filed byLenovo Inc. (Related document(s) #230 ) (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2018) Modified on 7/26/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Order finding as moot #163 Motion for Settlement entered by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 17, 2018 Filing 235 RESPONSE TO #233 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle . (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/17/2018) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2018 Filing 234 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Annasara G. Purcell by Superfish, Inc. (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 7/13/2018) Modified on 7/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/13/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting document and proposed orders to the Motion. Also, in the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:15-md-02624-HSG. No further action is necessary. Re: #231 Declaration in Support, filed by Richard Krause, John Whittle, Robert Ravencamp, Jessica N. Bennett, #230 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by Richard Krause, John Whittle, Robert Ravencamp, Jessica N. Bennett, #232 Declaration in Support, filed by Richard Krause, John Whittle, Robert Ravencamp, Jessica N. Bennett. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2018 Filing 232 Declaration of Steven Weisbrot in Support of #230 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Related document(s) #230 ) (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/11/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2018 Filing 231 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, Elizabeth A. Kramer, and Stephanie D. Biehl in Support of #230 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Exhibit A Thereto (Superfish Agreement); Exhibit B Thereto (Lenovo Agreement and Incorporated Exhibits 1-5); and Exhibit C Thereto (McFarlane Declaration) filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #230 ) (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/11/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2018 Filing 230 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 7/25/2018. Replies due by 8/1/2018. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/11/2018) Modified on 7/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #228 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval. Motions due by 7/11/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 228 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Lenovo, Inc., and Superfish, Inc. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2018 Filing 227 ***DISREGARD, INCORRECT INFO*** CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #163 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement, previously set for June 8, 2018 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) Modified on 5/23/2018 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #225 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval. Motions due by 6/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 22, 2018 Filing 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Lenovo Inc., and Superfish, Inc. (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/22/2018) Modified on 5/23/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2018 Filing 224 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/4/2018) Modified on 5/7/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #220 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sarah Clasby Engel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #221 Stipulation. Motions due by 5/25/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 221 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs and Lenovo. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/27/2018) Modified on 4/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/30/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2018 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please be sure that the case number is correctly reflected on your documents as 4:15-md-02624-HSG and that the Oakland Division is listed as court location. Re: #220 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Marie Wilson. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018) Modified on 4/27/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Sarah Clasby Engel by Marie Wilson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Engel, Sarah) (Filed on 4/26/2018) Modified on 4/27/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #218 Stipulation re. Amended Complaint Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 218 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, and all Plaintiffs. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/3/2018) Modified on 4/4/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2018 Filing 216 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for April 10, 2018, is continued to May 8, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 1, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/28/2018. (Not Reported) (Time: 4.0)Attorneys for Plaintiff: Alexandra Summer; Stephanie Biehl; Dena Sharp; Elizabeth Kramer; Jonathan Levine.Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Stephenson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2018)
March 1, 2018 Filing 215 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/1/2018. Lenovo shall make a proposal by March 14, 2018 and Plaintiffs shall respond by March 21, 2018. The parties shall submit a further settlement conference letter to the Court at jscpo@cand.uscourts.gov and each other by March 26, 2018. In person settlement conference is scheduled for March 28, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (Not Reported)(Time: 10 minutes)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Daniel Girard; Alexa Summer; Jonathan Levine. Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Stephenson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2018)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #213 Stipulation Re Further Case Management Order.Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2018; Case Management Conference set for 4/10/2018 02:00 PM; Amended Pleadings due by 4/16/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 213 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Further Case Management Order filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/21/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rafey Sarkis Balabanian (Balabanian, Rafey) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 211 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. To all parties and counsel of record: Please take notice that a settlement conference is scheduled for March 28, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley, in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue in San Francisco. Updated settlement conference statements shall be LODGED and emailed to JSCPO@cand.uscourts.gov by March 21, 2018. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING DEFENDANT LENOVOS PARTIAL #175 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2018; Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2018; Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2018 02:00 PM. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
September 22, 2017 Filing 209 RESPONSE to re #208 Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceedings by Lenovo Inc.. (Lowe, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2017) Modified on 9/25/2017 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2017 Filing 208 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions and Proceedings by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/8/2017) Modified on 9/11/2017 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2017 Filing 207 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 206 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 8, 2017, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #205 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2017. (Related documents(s) #205 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 8, 2017 before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 204 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing and Further Case Management Conference held on 6/8/2017. Total Time in Court 46 Minutes. Court Reporter Name Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney Jonathan Levine; Alexandra Summer; Elizabeth Kramer; Andre Mura; Clinton Krislov appearing via courtcall. Defendant Attorney Daniel Stephenson; Tyler Newby. Defendant Lenovo's motion to dismiss (docket no. #175 ) is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. Hearing on the Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval (docket no. #163 ) to be re- set by the Court. Written scheduling order to issue. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #201 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 8, 2017 Filing 202 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the ( #163 , #175 ) motion hearings and the further case management conference, previously set for today (June 8, 2017) at 2:00 p.m. will be held today before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 201 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Branden Hayden. (Krislov, Clinton) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 200 Plaintiffs' Statement of Recent Decision in Support of #179 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/7/2017) Modified on 6/8/2017 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 199 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 6/1/2017) Modified on 6/2/2017 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2017 Filing 198 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #163 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement and the #175 motion to dismiss, previously set for June 1, 2017, are continued to June 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. A case management conference has also been set for June 8, 2017, at 2:00 p.m. to be heard along with the motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 197 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law 349 Claim filed byLenovo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #175 ) (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 196 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
May 10, 2017 Filing 195 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of #179 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/10/2017) Modified on 5/11/2017 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2017 Filing 194 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 5/3/2017. Case did not settle. The parties shall contact the Court if they believe a further settlement conference would be helpful. (Not Reported) (Time: 7 hours)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Daniel Girard; Elizabeth Kramer; Alexa Summer; Elizabeth Pritzker; Jonathan Levine; Andre Mura. Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Stephenson. This is a text-only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/3/2017)
March 30, 2017 Filing 193 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2017. Further in person settlement conference set for 5/3/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated statements should be shared with the opposing counsel, emailed to jscpo@cand.uscourts.gov and lodged with chambers by noon on Friday, April 28, 2017. (Not Reported)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Alexa Summer; Elizabeth Kramer; Andre Mura; Jonathan Levine. Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Stephenson. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/30/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 192 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Stephanie Biehl (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 191 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying #189 Motion to Appear by Telephone at March 30, 2017 hearings. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 24, 2017 Filing 189 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at March 30, 2017 hearings filed by Ken Martini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Hill, James) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
March 20, 2017 Reset Hearings as to #163 MOTION for Settlement, and MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Docket No. #188 : Motion Hearings set for 6/1/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #187 Joint Stipulation for Further Case Management Order. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 20, 2017 Filing 187 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Further Case Management Order filed by In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/20/2017) Modified on 3/21/2017 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2017 Filing 186 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 3/17/2017. Parties to submit stipulation to District Court to continue March 30 hearing so settlement discussions can continue. Further Telephone Conference set for 3/30/2017 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (Not reported)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Alexa Summer; Steve Williams (FPS); Elizabeth Cramer; Jonathan Levine. Attorney for Defendant: Daniel Stephenson. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2017)
March 3, 2017 Filing 185 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 3/3/2017. Defendant to provide information to Plaintiffs by 3/10/17. The Court will hold a settlement telephone call with the parties on 3/17/17 at 9:00 a.m. (Not Reported) Plaintiff Attorneys: Daniel Girard; Andre Mura; Alexandra Summer; Steven Williams; Elizabeth Pritzker; Jonathan Levine. Defendant Attorney: Daniel Stephenson; Michael Willian.This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2017)
March 2, 2017 Filing 183 REPLY (re #175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law 349 Claim ) filed byLenovo Inc.. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 1, 2017 Filing 184 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CHANGE OF LOCATION FOR JUDGE GILLIAM:Effective March 2, 2017, Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.'s courtroom and chambers will be located in the Ronald V. Dellums Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. On or after March 2, 2017, all filings for matters pending on Judge Gilliam's docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse. The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Gilliam's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse; therefore, all case numbers assigned to him will be changed slightly to reflect the correct location. Previously, all case numbers started with 3 to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:15-cv-1129-HSG). As of March 2, 2017 all of Judge Gilliam's case files will begin with 4 to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:15-cv-1129-HSG). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 12-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse please go to: http://cand.uscourts.gov/locations-oakland ***THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.*** (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 182 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #163 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement with Defendant Superfish, Inc. and the #175 motion to dismiss, will held on March 30, 2017 before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. not in Oakland as advised in the previous [ 181] clerk's notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Filing 181 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the #163 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement with Defendant Superfish, Inc., previously set for February 23, 2017, is continued to March 30, 2017, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the #175 motion to dismiss, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 13, 2017 Filing 180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Simonoff (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
February 10, 2017 Filing 179 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to #175 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 2/10/2017) Modified on 2/13/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2017 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Cadio R. Zirpoli (Zirpoli, Cadio) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 30, 2017 Reset Deadline Pursuant to Docket No. #173 as to #175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law 349 Claim: Responses due by 2/10/2017; Replies due by 3/2/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/27/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 27, 2017 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 1/27/2017. In-person settlement conference is set for March 3, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., Court to issue Settlement Conference Order. Plaintiffs to make demand on Lenovo by Friday, February 3, 2017. Lenovo to respond by Friday, February 17, 2017. (Not Reported)Plaintiff Attorneys: Alexa Summers; Steven Williams; Daniel Girard; Elizabeth Kramer; Jonathan Levine. Defendant Attorney: Dan Stephenson. This is a text only Minute Entry (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law 349 Claim filed by Lenovo Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 1/31/2017. Replies due by 2/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2017)
January 17, 2017 Filing 174 Answer to #162 Amended Complaint byLenovo Inc.. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 1/17/2017) Modified on 1/18/2017 (alsS, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2017 Set Additional Deadlines Pursuant to Docket No. #173 : Motions due by 6/23/2017; Responses due by 7/21/2017; Replies due by 8/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Set Deadlines/Hearing Pursuant to Docket No. #173 : Motions due by 1/17/2017; Responses due by 2/10/2017; Replies due by 3/2/2017; Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Discovery due by 4/7/2017; Designation of Experts due by 4/21/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 5/12/2017; Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting (172) Stipulation and Case Management Order in case 3:15-md-02624-HSG. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
January 5, 2017 Filing 172 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 30, 2016 Filing 171 REPLY (re #163 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement With Defendant Superfish, Inc.) ) filed byJessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/30/2016)
December 23, 2016 Filing 170 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #163 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement With Defendant Superfish, Inc.) ) filed byLenovo Inc.. (Liu, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/23/2016)
December 21, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. REFERRING this matter to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline S. Corley for settlement proceedings under Local Rule 72-1. The parties will be advised of the date, time, and place of the next appearance by notice from Magistrate Judge Corley after New Year's Day. (This is a text-only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry.)(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
December 20, 2016 Filing 169 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2016 (Total Time in Court: 11 minutes). FTR Time 2:14-2:25. Plaintiff Attorney Alexander Summer; Elizabeth Kramer; Jonathan Levin; J. Jason Hill appearing via CourtCall. Defendant Attorney Daniel Stephenson. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding whether the Court should administratively close all the cases except the MDL case. Parties request that the Court refer the matter to Magistrate Judge Corley for a settlement conference. A joint status report is due one week from the completion of the settlement conference. The Court will set the case schedule at a CMC to be scheduled following receipt of the parties joint status report.This is a text only Minute Entry (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/20/2016)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #166 Motion to Appear by Telephone for December 20, 2016 Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 13, 2016 Electronic filing REMINDER. Re: #166 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for December 20, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Ken Martini Judge Gilliam Jr.'s signature line is as follows: Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. United States District Judge Not SENIOR District Judge. (ecgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016) Modified on 12/14/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2016 Filing 166 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for December 20, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Ken Martini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 165 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, Sterling International Consulting Group, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
December 13, 2016 Filing 164 ***DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #166 .*** MOTION to Appear by Telephone at December 20, 2016 Case Management Conference filed by Ken Martini. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Filed on 12/13/2016) Modified on 12/13/2016 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2016 Filing 163 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement With Defendant Superfish, Inc.) filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 12/23/2016. Replies due by 12/30/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexandra P. Summer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
December 7, 2016 Filing 162 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated) against Lenovo Inc., Superfish, Inc.. Filed byRichard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Jessica N. Bennett. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #160 Stipulation Re Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 12/7/2016 (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re. Amended Complaint filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/22/2016) Modified on 11/23/2016 (ecgS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2016 Filing 159 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for December 20, 2016, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Case Management Statement due by December 13, 2016. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 158 Statement By Plaintiffs re: Schedule for Approval of Class Action Settlement As To Defendant Superfish by Jessica N. Bennett, Rhonda Estrella, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 9, 2016 Filing 157 STIPULATION to Extend Lenovo's Deadline to Respond to Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Lenovo Inc.. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 11/9/2016)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Ronald M. Whyte no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/01/2016. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte re #95 , #105 , #130 , #135 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting in part and denying in part (98) Motion to Dismiss and (131) Motion to Certify Class. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED AMENDED STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8, granting as modified #150 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 10/20/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2016)
October 17, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Biehl (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 7, 2016 Filing 150 AMENDED STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8 filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/7/2016) Modified on 10/11/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2016 Filing 149 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8 filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/28/2016) Modified on 9/29/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2016 Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Motion Hearing held on 9/23/2016 re #131 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Richard Krause, John Whittle, Robert Ravencamp, Jessica N. Bennett and Rhonda Estrella. Counsel present oral argument. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 56 minutes (9:19 to 10:15). Court Reporter Name: Gina Colin. For Plaintiff(s): Jonathan Levine, Alexandra Summer and Andre Mura. For Defendant(s): Daniel Stephenson. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2016)
September 20, 2016 Filing 147 OPPOSITION TO LENOVOS OBJECTIONS TO REBUTTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re #144 Objection by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 9/20/2016) Text modified on 9/20/2016 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY J. JASON HILL'S REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT SEPTEMBER 23, 2016 HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION, granting #145 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 9/20/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
September 19, 2016 Filing 145 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON MOTION TO FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Ken Martini. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Filed on 9/19/2016) Text modified on 9/20/2016 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2016 Filing 144 OBJECTIONS TO REPLY EVIDENCE FILED WITH AND RELIED UPON IN PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Lenovo Inc. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 9/16/2016) Modified on 9/19/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2016 Filing 143 DECLARATION OF JONATHAN K. LEVINE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re #142 filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/9/2016) Modified on 9/12/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2016 Filing 142 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (re #131 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/9/2016) Modified on 9/12/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2016 Filing 141 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7, granting #134 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/24/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 23, 2016 Filing 140 DECLARATION OF TYLER G. NEWBY IN SUPPORT OF LENOVOS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Superfish, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 8/23/2016) Modified on 8/24/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2016 Filing 139 STIPULATION REGARDING DISMISSAL OF RHONDA ESTRELLAS ACTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A) filed by Rhonda Estrella. (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/23/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2016 ***Resetting deadlines. 1.) The deposition of Lenovo employee and declarant Feng Lee shall go forward on 8/31/2016 instead of 9/8/2016; 2.) Plaintiffs shall file their reply on the class certification motion by 9/9/2016 instead of 9/2/2016 and 3.) The hearing on plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall remain scheduled for 9:00 am on 9/23/2016. Pursuant to ECF No. #138 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE, granting #137 . Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 8/23/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 22, 2016 Filing 137 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Rhonda Estrella, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/22/2016) Modified on 8/23/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2016 Filing 136 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (re #131 MOTION to Certify Class filed b Lenovo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Stephenson in Support of Lenovo's Opposition to Class Certification, #2 Exhibits 1 - 10, #3 Exhibits 11 - 20, #4 Exhibits 21 - 29, #5 Exhibits 30 - 38, #6 Exhibits 39 - 43, #7 Exhibit 44 (Redacted Version), #8 Exhibit 45, #9 Exhibit 46, #10 Exhibits 47 - 48, #11 Exhibit 49, #12 Exhibit 50)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/19/2016) Modified on 8/22/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2016 Filing 135 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lenovo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Stephenson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 44, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 44)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 134 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7 filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/18/2016) Modified on 8/19/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2016 Filing 133 DECLARATION OF TYLER G. NEWBY RE PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re #130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Superfish, Inc.(Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 7/26/2016) Modified on 7/27/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2016 Filing 132 DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. STEPHENSON IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR UNDER SEAL FILING OF PORTIONS OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re #130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Lenovo Inc.. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/26/2016) Modified on 7/26/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2016 Filing 131 MOTION for Class Certification filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Rhonda Estrella, Richard Krause, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle. Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 8/19/2016. Replies due by 9/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1 - 37, #3 Exhibit 38, #4 Exhibit 39, #5 Exhibit 40, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 42, #8 Exhibit 43, #9 Exhibit 44 (Redacted Version), #10 Exhibit 45 (Redacted Version), #11 Exhibit 46, #12 Declaration of Interim Class Counsel, #13 Exhibit A, #14 Exhibit B, #15 Exhibit C, #16 Proposed Order)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2016) Modified on 7/26/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2016 Filing 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Jessica N. Bennett, Rhonda Estrella, Robert Ravencamp, John Whittle, Richard Krause. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth C. Pritzker, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 1 - 12, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 13 - 18, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 19 - 24, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Versions of Exhibits 25 - 37, #9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 44, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 44, #11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 45, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 45, #13 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2016)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, granting ECF No. 128 in 5:15-md-02624-RMW re 5:15-cv-01166-RMW. Case 5:15-cv-01166-RMW is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs Wood and Wilson reserve the right to proceed in this matter as absent class members. The Clerk shall close case file 5:15-cv-01166-RMW. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 6/28/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 128 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure in Case re 15-1166 by Thomas Wilson, Russell Wood (Dalbey, Christopher) (Filed on 6/27/2016) Modified on 6/28/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 27, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 9, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #126 Order. Opposition due by 8/19/2016. Reply due by 9/2/2016. Plaintiffs Class Certification Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MODIFIED ORDER granting #125 Stipulation Re Case Management Order No. 5. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to stipulation of the parties that: Plaintiffs class certification motion shall be filed by 7/22/2016; Defendants Opposition is due 8/19/2016; Plaintiffs reply is due 9/2/2016; Hearing on Plaintiffs class certification motion will be heard on 9/23/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. All other deadlines are extended as set forth in the stipulated order. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/9/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2016)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, granting #124 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Herbert Phillips, Susan Tam. Signed by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte on 6/8/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 125 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2016) Modified on 6/7/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, Civil Case No. 5:15-cv-02788-RMW Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs Herbert Phillips and Susan Tam, by and through counsel by Herbert Phillips, Susan Tam (Dalbey, Christopher) (Filed on 6/6/2016) Modified on 6/7/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting #122 Application for Admission of Attorney for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew N. Lowe Counsel for Lenovo (United States), Inc. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 5/31/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 26, 2016 Filing 122 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Matthew Lowe ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10482784.) filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Certificate of Good Standing))(Lowe, Matthew) (Filed on 5/26/2016) Modified on 5/27/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2016 Filing 121 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY MARK A. FRIEL by John Levenhagen (Friel, Mark) (Filed on 5/23/2016) Modified on 5/24/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Liu, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/4/2016) Modified on 5/4/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2016 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL of Rebecca Liu filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Liu, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/4/2016) Modified on 5/4/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting (117) Stipulation re Case Management Order No. 4 in case 5:15-md-02624-RMW. It is hereby ordered pursuant to stipulation of the parties that: Plaintiffs shall file their class certification motion by 6/21/2016; Non-Expert discovery cut-off is 8/24/2016; Expert reports shall be served by 9/23/2016; Opposition to expert reports shall be served by 10/24/2016; Reply expert reports shall be served by 11/7/2016; and the last day to file summary judgment/dispositive motions is 12/2/2016. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/28/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 14, 2016 Filing 117 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Pritzker, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/14/2016) Modified on 4/15/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2016 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2016 re #98 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. Oral Argument heard. The Court took the matter under submission. The Court to prepare the Order. Plaintiff Attorney: Elizabeth Pritzker, Jonathan Levine, Elizabeth Kramer, Andre Mura, Matthew Edling. Defendant Attorney: Daniel Stephenson. Total Time in Court:9:05-9:25 (Mins.20). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. This is a text only Minute Entry (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2016)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting #113 Request for Telephonic Appearance at Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall directly at (866) 582-6878. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/31/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 30, 2016 Filing 114 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL Andre Michel Mura filed by Plaintiffs Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, and Alan Woyt (Mura, Andre) (Filed on 3/30/2016) Modified on 3/30/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2016 Filing 113 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT filed by Ken Martini. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed ) Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Filed on 3/28/2016) Modified on 3/29/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2016 Filing 112 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING Defendant LENOVO (United States), Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6), #98 (in 5:15-md-02624-RMW) Hearing. Please take notice that hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is reset from 3/11/2016 to 4/1/2016 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte in case 5:15-cv-00807-RMW; granting (104) Motion to Stay as to defendant Superfish in case 5:15-md-02624-RMW. CLERK PLEASE FLAG STAY AS TO SPECIFIC DEFENDANT ON DOCKET SHEET.(rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting (107) Stipulation Re Case Management Order No. 3 in case 5:15-md-02624-RMW. Signed by by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 3/4/2016.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 109 REPLY RE JOINT MOTION TO STAY AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERFISH (re #104 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2016) Modified on 3/4/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2016 Filing 108 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF LENOVOS MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT( re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 3/1/2016) Modified on 3/2/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2016 Filing 107 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re #98 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) ) (Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed) filed bySterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 17, 2016 Filing 105 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Opposition to Lenovo's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #3 Exhibit A (Redacted Version), #4 Exhibit B (Unredacted Version), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2016)
February 11, 2016 Filing 104 NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERFISH ; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 2/25/2016. Replies due by 3/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 (Proposed)Order)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/11/2016) Modified on 2/12/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting #100 Stipulation and MODIFIED Order Re Briefing on Lenovo's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. It is hereby ordered that: Plaintiffs opposition to Lenovo's motion to dismiss shall be due 2/17/2016; Lenovo's reply is due 3/1/2016. The hearing on the motion to dismiss shall remain on 3/11/2016. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/26/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting #101 Stipulation STAYING DEADLINES AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERFISH. It is hereby ordered: If the Parties have not executed a Settlement Agreement by February 11, 2016, the stay shall be lifted and Defendant Superfish shall be obligated to respond to Plaintiffs Consolidated Amended Complaint by February 18, 2015. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 1/26/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
January 22, 2016 Filing 101 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER STAYING DEADLINES AS TO DEFENDANT SUPERFISH filed by Superfish, Inc.. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/25/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2016 Filing 100 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE BRIEFING ON LENOVOS MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ricardo Alaniz, Sandra Allen, Austin Ardman, Ross M. Babbitt, Mary Jane Barbosa, Hank Baumer, Ryan Baumgartner, Michelle Behren, Thomas Behrendt, Jessica N. Bennett, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Allan Bogh, Richard Brooks, Laura Burns, Thomas Carney, Jill Cazaubon, Jennifer Cole, Jayne Constanzo, Bill Cullifer, Lauren Dannheim, Beatriz Davis, Jennifer Davis, Edward Dressel, Christopher Dunn, Gabe Duran, Wendy Duran, Liz Edwards, Sam Ellis, Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, Joel Foster, Donald Gearhart, Keng Gee, Joseph Guerra, Brian Gutterman, Christopher Hall, Heather Hare, Dennis Hasty, Branden Hayden, Jose Hidalgo, David Hunter, In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation, Douglas Irwin, JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's, Stanley D Johnson, Patrick Johnson, Neeraj Kalra, Matthew Kelso, Ryan Kemper, Dmitriy Khazak, Thomas Kim, Jim Kopps, Rajkumar Kothapa, Michele Large, John Levenhagen, Arul Louis, ThomaS Lucas, Ken Martini, Tom Miller, Eric Moretti, Michael Morici, Trevor Murdock, Dan Onken, Travis Palmer, Dien Phan, Herbert Phillips, Lukas Pick, Elizabeth Pratt, Robert Qakish, Robert Ravencamp, Michael Reinert, Tina Richman, Candace Rose, Danielle Rougier, Ray Schmalzer, Richard Seedroff, Zeshan Sheikh, Gary Sherman, Chris Shouts, Michael Simonoff, Alice Spalitta, Zachary Stein, Sterling International Consulting Group, Connie Supernault, Russ Takle, Nate Talley, Susan Tam, Nikolas Theriot, Nick Thweatt, Ryan Tuckerman, Ariella Vasquez, Susan Webster Schultz, Susan Webster-Shultz, John Whittle, Amanda Williams, Marie Wilson, Thomas Wilson, Vincent Wong, David Wood, Russell Wood, Kate Woods, Alan Woyt, Ivan Wu, Kyle Youngs, Liangfang Zhao, Nagasubrahmanyam kummaragunta. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/25/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2016 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE by David L Heinemann (Heinemann, David) (Filed on 1/22/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2016 Filing 98 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 2/4/2016. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Daniel J. Stephenson, #3 Exhibit A to Stephenson Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Stephenson Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Stephenson Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Stephenson Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Stephenson Declaration, #8 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit C to Request forJudicial Notice, #12 Exhibit D to Request for Judicial Notice, #13 Exhibit E to Request for Judicial Notice, #14 (Proposed) Order)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 1/21/2016) Modified on 1/22/2016 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2015 Filing 97 DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. STEPHENSON IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR UNDER SEAL FILING OF CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re #95 filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2015 Filing 96 ALLEGED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; REDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE SEALEDi against Lenovo (United States) Inc., Superfish, Inc.. Filed bySterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2015 Filing 95 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAIT filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Complaint (Exhibit A), #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Complaint (Exhibit B), #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2015) Modified on 11/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting (93) Stipulation in case 5:15-md-02624-RMW Re: Case Management Order No. 2. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 11/10/2015. (amk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2015)
November 9, 2015 Filing 93 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2 filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2015) Modified on 11/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2015 Filing 92 JOINT MEDIATION STATUS REPORT by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/30/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2015 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ALEXANDRA P. SUMMER (Summer, Alexandra) (Filed on 10/29/2015) Modified on 11/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Ronald M. Whyte granting #89 Stipulation. (rmwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
October 7, 2015 Filing 89 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/7/2015) Modified on 10/7/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2015 Filing 88 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lesley Elizabeth Weaver (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 9/15/2015)
September 14, 2015 Filing 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas Kim (Campion, Douglas) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #82 for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information and/or Trade Secrets. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/1/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 9/1/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
August 27, 2015 Filing 83 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Herbert Phillips, Susan Tam, Thomas Wilson, Russell Wood (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Greenwald, Robin) (Filed on 8/27/2015) Modified on 8/27/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Filing 84 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/26/2015. COURT ACTION: The parties have a mediation with Judge Infante set for 10/28/2015. The parties are to file a status report on 10/30/2015 to advise the Court on the mediation session. If any party is requesting a Further Case Management Conference, please include that in the status report. The Court adopts the case schedule in the Joint Case Management Conference Statement. The Court will prepare an order following the conference. Court Reporter Name: Not Reported. Court Time: [10:30 AM to 11:00 AM]. Plaintiff Attorney: M. Edling, J. Levine, E. Kramer, D. Girard. Defendant Attorney: D. Stephenson, J. Iloulian, R. Cole. This is a text only Minute Entry (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2015)
August 25, 2015 Filing 82 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING PATENTS, HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 8/25/2015) Modified on 8/26/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15, on behalf of Plaintiff by John Levenhagen (Dukelow, Cornelius) (Filed on 8/24/2015) Modified on 8/25/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance of Cornelius Pellman Dukelow by John Levenhagen (Dukelow, Cornelius) (Filed on 8/24/2015) Modified on 8/25/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2015 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Lukas Pick for Court Reporter Georgina Galvan-Colin. (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
August 21, 2015 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE -15 by Joel Foster (Friend, John) (Filed on 8/21/2015) Modified on 8/24/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2015 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Marie Wilson (Harke, Lance) (Filed on 8/21/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 76 Correction of Docket #74 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Michael Simonoff (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVI LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Jessica N. Bennett (Naraghi, Natasha) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 74 Please Disregard. Docketed in Error. See Docket #76 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Simonoff (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by David Hunter (Larry, James) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 72 AMENDED CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Robert Ravencamp (Lange, Ethan) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Text modified on 8/21/2015 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 71 CERTIFICATION ACTIONS OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Robert Ravencamp (Lange, Ethan) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Vincent Wong, Nagasubrahmanyam Kummaragunta (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Branden Hayden (Krislov, Clinton) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 68 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Susan Webster Schultz (Hammarskjold, Carl) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 67 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Michelle Behren (Lehrman, Seth) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 66 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Lukas Pick (Dearman, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15by Ryan Baumgartner, Laura Burns, Thomas Carney, Jayne Constanzo, Beatriz Davis, Gabe Duran, Wendy Duran, Christopher Hall, Dennis Hasty, Matthew Kelso, Michael Morici (Choi, Mario) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES or PERSONS by Stanley D Johnson, Nick Thweatt (Federman, William) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 63 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Ken Martini (Hill, James) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2015 Filing 62 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Ricardo Alaniz, Sandra Allen, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Sam Ellis, Dan Onken, Dien Phan, Richard Seedroff, Gary Sherman, Ryan Tuckerman, Amanda Williams, David Wood (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 Filing 61 JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/19/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 Filing 60 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-15 by Ross M. Babbitt (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 8/19/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2015 Filing 59 FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CIVIL L.R. 3-15 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Superfish, Inc. (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 8/19/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 58 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PARTIES by Lenovo (United States) Inc. (Iloulian, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 57 STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order selecting Mediation by Sterling International Consulting Group filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 56 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Filing 55 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, Alan Woyt (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 8/18/2015) Modified on 8/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL by Hon. Ronald M. Whyte, granting #50 and #51 . Attorney Frank Mari and Michael J. Roper terminated. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
August 17, 2015 Filing 53 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PARTIES by JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's (Edling, Matthew) (Filed on 8/17/2015) Modified on 8/18/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jeffrey Adam Iloulian (Iloulian, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 11, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger R Cole, Tyler G Newby and Annasara G Purcell of Fenwick and West, LLP as its Attorneys of record in the above captioned action in place of its local counsel for the Eastern District of North Carolina, Western Division, D Martin of Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough, LLP and (Proposed) Order filed by Superfish, Inc.. (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2015 Filing 50 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Rodger R Cole, Tyler G Newby and Annasara G Purcell of Fenwick and West, LLP as its Attorneys of record in the above captioned action in place of its local counsel for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division Michael J Roper and Frank M Mari of Bell and Roper PA ; and (Proposed) Order filed by Superfish, Inc. (Purcell, Annasara) (Filed on 8/11/2015) Modified on 8/12/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2015 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Barton Dalbey (Dalbey, Christopher) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 10, 2015 Filing 48 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 17, 2015, before Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Galvan Colin, Telephone number 408 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #40 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2015. (Related documents(s) #40 ) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
August 4, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance of David K Stein by Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, Alan Woyt (Stein, David) (Filed on 8/4/2015) Modified on 8/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/4/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew B. George filed by Ryan Baumgartner, et al (George, Matthew) (Filed on 7/30/2015) Modified on 7/31/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF JOSEPH SAVERI LAW FIRM, INC. by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/29/2015) Text moified on 7/30/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Judge Ronald M. Whyte. Denying #14 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 5:15-cv-01712-RMW; Denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Granting #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; Denying #7 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 5:15-md-02624-RMW. The Court finds Pritzker Levine, Cotchett, and Girard Gibbs as Interim Lead Counsel. Accordingly, the Court appoints Jonathan K. Levine and Elizabeth C. Pritzker of Pritzker Levine, Philip L. Gregory, Steven N. Williams, and Matthew K. Edling of Cotchett, and Daniel C. Girard and Elizabeth A. Kramer of Girard Gibbs as interim lead counsel. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
July 22, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE OF FILING OF (PROPOSED) ORDER re #3 , 39 by Ricardo Alaniz, Sandra Allen, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Sam Ellis, Dan Onken, Dien Phan, Richard Seedroff, Gary Sherman, Ryan Tuckerman, Amanda Williams, David Wood (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 7/22/2015) Modified on 7/22/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2015 Filing 42 (Proposed) Order Regarding Interim Lead Counsel by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/22/2015) Modified on 7/23/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2015 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's for Court Reporter Georgina Colin. (Edling, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 21, 2015 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Ross M. Babbitt for Court Reporter Georgina Colin. (Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte: Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2015. re (7 in 5:15-md-02624-RMW) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Ross M. Babbitt, (3 in 5:15-md-02624-RMW) MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Sam Ellis, Dien Phan, Ricardo Alaniz, Richard Seedroff, Dan Onken, David Wood, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Gary Sherman, Ryan Tuckerman, Amanda Williams, Sandra Allen, (6 in 5:15-md-02624-RMW) MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof] filed by Lukas Pick, David Hunter, (5 in 5:15-md-02624-RMW) MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. COURT ACTION: The Court heard argument from the parties and took the matter under submission. The matter is deemed submitted and the Court to issue a ruling. The parties are to submit a proposed order as to the duties of lead counsel. Court Reporter Name: Gina Colin. Court Time: [9:04 to 10:08]. Plaintiff Attorney: J. Leviton, L. Weaver, A. Duncan for Plaintiff Wood; M. Dearman, P. Coughlin for Plaintiffs Hunt & Pick; J. Levine, P. Gregory, M. Edling for Plaitniff Sterling Group; W. Federman for Plaintiffs Johnson & Thweatt; D. Girard for Plaintiff Estrella; M. Johnson for Plaintiff Simonoff; R. Balabanian for Plaintiff Hunter; J. Saveri for Plaintiff Babbit; E. Adler for Plaintiffs Bannett & Martini. Defendant Attorney: R. Cole, A. Purcell for Superfish; D. Stephenson for Lenovo. This is a text only Minute Entry (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2015)
July 20, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of by Christopher Shank by Robert Ravencamp (Shank, Christopher) (Filed on 7/20/2015) Modified on 7/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLANITIFF KEN MARTINI by Ken Martini. (Hill, James) (Filed on 7/17/2015) Modified on 7/17/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DAVID L. HEINEMANN by Robert Ravencamp (Heinemann, David) (Filed on 7/16/2015) Modified on 7/17/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Jeffrey Adam Iloulianfor Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Iloulian, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2015) Modified on 7/15/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 34 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL (re #7 filed by Ross M. Babbitt. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/14/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF TODD M. SCHNEIDER AND MARK T. JOHNSON (Johnson, Mark) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/14/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 32 JOINT REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL (re #6 filed by David Hunter, Lukas Pick. (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/14/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 31 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSE (re #5 filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/14/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Ethan Michael Lange by Robert Ravencamp (Lange, Ethan) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance of Barrett Jay Vahle by Robert Ravencamp (Vahle, Barrett) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Norman E. Siegel by Robert Ravencamp (Siegel, Norman) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2015 Filing 27 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL (re #3 filed by Ricardo Alaniz, Sandra Allen, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Sam Ellis, Dan Onken, Dien Phan, Richard Seedroff, Gary Sherman, Ryan Tuckerman, Amanda Williams, David Wood. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 7/13/2015) Modified on 7/13/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance of Patrick J. Coughlin filed by Lukas Pick (Coughlin, Patrick) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance of Elizabeth Antonia Kramer filed by filed by Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, Alan Woyt (Kramer, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF AMANDA M. STEINER filed by Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, Alan Woyt (Steiner, Amanda) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL filed by Rhonda Estrella, Sonia Ferezan, John Whittle, Alan Woyt (Girard, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Marie Wilson (Harke, Lance) (Filed on 7/9/2015) Modified on 7/10/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 21 RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL (re #7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof] ) filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO COMPETING MOTIONS TO APPOINT INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL (re #7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof], #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Ricardo Alaniz, Sandra Allen, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Sam Ellis, Dan Onken, Dien Phan, Richard Seedroff, Gary Sherman, Ryan Tuckerman, Amanda Williams, David Wood. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Leviton, #2 Exhibit A to Leviton Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Leviton Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Leviton Declaration)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 19 JOEL FOSTERS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL (re #7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel [Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof] , #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel) filed by Joel Foster. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John S. Friend in Support of Joel Foster's Response to Motions for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel)(Friend, John) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 18 JOINT RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL re #7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel, #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel
July 7, 2015 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew Kendall Edling by JGX, Inc. (Edling, Matthew) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/7/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2015 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL (re #7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel , #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Joint Notice of Motion and Motion for the Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof], #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel As Interim Co-Lead Counsel filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Stephenson, #2 Exhibit A to Stephenson Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Stephenson Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Stephenson Declaration)(Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/7/2015) Modified on 7/7/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JOSEPH R. SAVERI by Ross M. Babbitt (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MATTHEW S. WEILER by Ross M. Babbitt(Weiler, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/8/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance of Kevin E. Rayhill by Ross M. Babbitt (Rayhill, Kevin) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Daniel James Stephenson for Defendant Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Stephenson, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance of Tyler Griffin Newby for Defendant Superfish, Inc. (Newby, Tyler) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Rodger R. Cole for Defendant Superfish, Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/1/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2015 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Annasara Guzzo Purcell
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 6/24/15. (jgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 24, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Ross M. Babbitt. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Ronald M. Whyte. Responses due by 7/7/2015. Replies due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Saveri Declaration ISO Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 6/24/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 6 JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CO-LEAD CLASS COUNSEL AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by David Hunter, Lukas Pick. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark J. Dearman in support thereof, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 (Proposed) Order) (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 6/23/2015) Modified on 6/24/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2015 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Sterling International Consulting Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan K. Levine, #2 Declaration of Daniel C. Girard, #3 Declaration of Matthew K. Edling, #4(Proposed) Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Levine, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/23/2015) Modified on 6/24/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Carmen Anthony Medici by Lukas Pick (Medici, Carmen) (Filed on 6/23/2015) Modified on 6/25/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPOINT INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL filed by David Wood, Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth, Dan Onken, Richard Seedroff, Sandra Allen, Sam Ellis, Ryan Tuckerman, Dien Phan, Gary Sherman, Amanda Williams, Ricardo Alaniz. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jason M. Leviton, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Leviton Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. B to Leviton Declaration, #5 Exhibit Ex. C to Leviton Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. D to Leviton Declaration, #7 Exhibit Ex. E to Leviton Declaration (Pt. 1/3), #8 Exhibit Ex. E to Leviton Declaration (Pt. 2/3), #9 Exhibit Ex. E to Leviton Declaration (Pt. 3/3), #10 Declaration of Alan W. Duncan, #11 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Alan Duncan, #12 (Proposed) Order)(Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 6/23/2015) Modified on 6/24/2015 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2015 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 8, 2015, and with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Ronald M. Whyte. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
June 19, 2015 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER dated June 8, 2015, from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Ronald M. Whyte for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Constanzo
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Webster-Shultz
Represented By: Carl Nils Hammarskjold
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Travis Luke Manfredi
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Behren
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariella Vasquez
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sherman
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cole
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ravencamp
Represented By: Ethan Michael Lange
Represented By: Christopher Shank
Represented By: Barrett Jay Vahle
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: David L Heinemann
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Norman E. Siegel
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Gearhart
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russ Takle
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Palmer
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keng Gee
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Onken
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kopps
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Guerra
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wood
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jane Barbosa
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Duran
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liangfang Zhao
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Krause
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Brooks
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Ferezan
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Represented By: David K. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross M. Babbitt
Represented By: Andrew Michael Purdy
Represented By: Kevin E. Rayhill
Represented By: Matthew Sinclair Weiler
Represented By: Joseph R. Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Phillips
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Represented By: Christopher Barton Dalbey
Represented By: Robin L. Greenwald
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Wong
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Mona Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hall
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kemper
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Davis
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Schmalzer
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Pratt
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sterling International Consulting Group
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Elizabeth Cheryl Pritzker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Youngs
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Rougier
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hare
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Ardman
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Irwin
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Wu
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajkumar Kothapa
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Bogh
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Williams
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Carney
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabe Duran
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neeraj Kalra
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Moretti
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morici
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Tuckerman
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yudhisthir Bissoonnauth
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Shouts
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Dressel
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Whittle
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lukas Pick
Represented By: Carmen Anthony Medici
Represented By: Mark Dearman
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Alaniz
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dien Phan
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica N. Bennett
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Represented By: Natasha N. Serino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Martini
Represented By: Timothy Douglas Cohelan
Represented By: Michael David Singer
Represented By: ELLIOT ADLER
Represented By: James Jason Hill
Represented By: Isam Charles Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kate Woods
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nagasubrahmanyam kummaragunta
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Represented By: Mona Amini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Levenhagen
Represented By: Steve Douglas Larson
Represented By: Mark A. Friel
Represented By: Cornelius Pellman Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Foster
Represented By: Tyler Z. Korus
Represented By: Robert W. Bishop
Represented By: John S. Friend,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Thweatt
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Talley
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reinert
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Dannheim
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ThomaS Lucas
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Supernault
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Seedroff
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arul Louis
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Edwards
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Wilson
Represented By: Adam Matthew Moskowitz
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Represented By: Robert J Neary,
Represented By: Jack Scarola
Represented By: Sarah Clasby Engel,
Represented By: Lance August Harke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Simonoff
Represented By: Todd M. Schneider
Represented By: Mark T. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Hidalgo
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dunn
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Estrella
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Represented By: David K. Stein
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hasty
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Hayden
Represented By: Clinton Arthur Krislov
Represented By: John P Orellana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Spalitta
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley D Johnson
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Cazaubon
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hunter
Represented By: Amir Cheyenne Missaghi
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Rafey Sarkis Balabanian
Represented By: Samuel Lasser
Represented By: James Dominick Larry
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitriy Khazak
Represented By: Zachary R Scribner
Represented By: Daniel Timothy LeBel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Johnson
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolas Theriot
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Wood
Represented By: James Bilsborrow
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Christopher Barton Dalbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Qakish
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Tam
Represented By: James Jackson Bilsborrow
Represented By: Christopher Barton Dalbey
Represented By: Robin L. Greenwald
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Cullifer
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Large
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Richman
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Kelso
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Murdock
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Behrendt
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Stein
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gutterman
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Baumgartner
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JGX, Inc. d/b/a Lefty O'Doul's
Represented By: Elizabeth Tran Castillo
Represented By: Alexandra P Summer
Represented By: Steven Noel Williams
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Matthew Kendall Edling
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Ellis
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Davis
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Miller
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Allen
Represented By: Joel A. Fleming
Represented By: Jason M. Leviton
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Alan W. Duncan
Represented By: Stephen McDaniel Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Webster Schultz
Represented By: Cadio R. Zirpoli
Represented By: Carl Nils Hammarskjold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hank Baumer
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kim
Represented By: Douglas James Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Woyt
Represented By: Andre Michel Mura
Represented By: Elizabeth Antonia Kramer
Represented By: Daniel C. Girard
Represented By: Amanda M Steiner
Represented By: David K. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Rose
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Burns
Represented By: David A. Straite
Represented By: Linda M. Fong
Represented By: Frederic S. Fox
Represented By: Marc A. Wites
Represented By: Matthew B. George
Represented By: Mario Man-Lung Choi
Represented By: Laurence D. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wilson
Represented By: James Bilsborrow
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Christopher Barton Dalbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeshan Sheikh
Represented By: Phillip C Kim
Represented By: Laurence Matthew Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Inc.
Represented By: Raymond M. Bennett
Represented By: Rebecca Liu
Represented By: Vivian Injung Kim
Represented By: Hayden J. Silver, III
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Iloulian
Represented By: Daniel James Stephenson
Represented By: Betsy Cook Lanzen
Represented By: Christina Noel Goodrich
Represented By: Amanda G. Ray
Represented By: Matthew N. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superfish, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Griffin Newby
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Represented By: Frank Mari
Represented By: Annasara Guzzo Purcell
Represented By: Rodger R. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re: Lenovo Adware Litigation
Represented By: Jonathan Krasne Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?